blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1371235

EP1371235 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR COMPRESSING SOFTWARE CODE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.11.2009
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip13.11.2009Change - representativepublished on 16.12.2009  [2009/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company (a Delaware Corporation)
3000 Hanover Street
Palo ALto CA 94304 / US
Former [2003/51]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company (a Delaware corporation)
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ROSS, Richard, A.
721 Santa Barbara Road
Berkeley, CA 94707 / US
 [2003/51]
Representative(s)Jackson, Richard Eric, et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/51]Jackson, Richard Eric, et al
Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Former [2003/51]Jackson, Richard Eric, et al
Carpmaels & Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date99916285.201.04.1999
[2003/51]
WO1999US07217
Priority number, dateUS1998005326001.04.1998         Original published format: US 53260
[2003/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO9951039
Date:07.10.1999
Language:EN
[1999/40]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1371235
Date:17.12.2003
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2003/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US02.10.2003
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.01.2005
ClassificationIPC:G06F9/45
[2005/06]
CPC:
G06F8/4434 (EP,US); G06F9/44521 (EP,US); Y10S707/99942 (US)
Former IPC [2003/51]H04Q1/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2003/51]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR KOMPRIMIERUNG VON SOFTWARE KODE[2003/51]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR COMPRESSING SOFTWARE CODE[2003/51]
French:SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE COMPRESSION DE CODES DE LOGICIEL[2003/51]
Entry into regional phase25.09.2000National basic fee paid 
25.09.2000Search fee paid 
25.09.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
25.09.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.11.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
25.09.2000Examination requested  [2004/27]
05.09.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.03.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.02.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.06.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.02.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.06.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/50]
21.07.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2009/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
22.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
26.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
20.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
26.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
27.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
25.04.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200911   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0788239  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 22 * column 2, line 26 - column 5, line 8 * * column 6, line 32 - column 15, line 48 * [A] 1-21;
 [XY]  - LEFURGY C ET AL, "Improving code density using compression techniques", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 30TH ANNUAL IEEE/ACM INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON MICROARCHITECTURE. MICRO-30. RESEARCH TRIANGLE PARK, NC, DEC. 1 - 3, 1997, PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON MICROARCHITEC TURE, LOS ALAMITOS, CA : IEEE COMPUTER SO, (19971201), vol. 30TH CONF, ISBN 0-8186-7977-8, pages 194 - 203, XP010261296 [X] 22 * the whole document * [Y] 1-21

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MICRO.1997.645810
 [YA]  - T. LINDHOLM, F. YELLIN, The Java Virtual Machine Specification (first edition), USA, ADDISON-WESLEY, (1997), ISBN 0-201-63452, XP002310472 [Y] 1-21 * Chapters 2, 4, 5 * [A] 22
 [A]  - PROEBSTING T A ED - ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTING MACHINERY, "Optimizing an ANSI C interpreter with superoperators", CONFERENCE RECORD OF POPL '95: 22ND. ACM SIGPLAN-SIGACT PRINCIPLES OF PROGRAMMING LANGUAGES. SAN FRANCISCO, JAN. 22 - 25, 1995, CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE ACM SIGPLAN-SIGACT SYMPOSIUM ON PRINCIPLES OFPROGRAMMING LANGUAGES, NEW YORK, ACM PRESS, US, (19950122), vol. SYMP. 22, ISBN 0-89791-692-1, pages 322 - 332, XP002202605 [A] 1-22 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/199448.199526
 [A]  - LAMBRIGHT H D ED - INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, "JAVA BYTECODE OPTIMIZATIONS", PROCEEDINGS OF IEEE COMPCON '97. SAN JOSE, FEB. 23 - 26, 1997, LOS ALAMITOS, IEEE COMP. SOC. PRESS, US, (19970223), ISBN 0-8186-7805-4, pages 206 - 210, XP000751784 [A] 1-22 * the whole document *
International search[Y]US5572206  (MILLER JOHN W [US], et al);
 [YP]US5857197  (MULLINS WARD [US]);
 [T]US5907707  (RAMALINGAM GANESAN [US], et al);
 [Y]  - PRESCOD P, "SUPPLIER NUMBER: 20101050 XML: THE INTERSECTION OF DOCUMENTS AND DATABASES ON THE INTERNET.", URL: HTTP://WWW.DIALOGWEB.COM/SEARCH.HTML, (19990603), XP002919202
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.