Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1069874

EP1069874 - MEMBRANE WITH TISSUE-GUIDING SURFACE CORRUGATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.11.2005
Database last updated on 22.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.05.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 04.06.2008  [2008/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Macropore, Inc.
6740 Top Gun Street
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[2001/04]
Inventor(s)01 / LEMPERLE, Stefan, M.
215 Bonair Street 8
La Jolla, CA 92037 / US
02 / CALHOUN, Christopher, J.
4939 Mt. Harris Drive
San Diego, CA 92117 / US
 [2001/04]
Representative(s)Baker, Colin John
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/04]Baker, Colin John
Eric Potter Clarkson Park View House 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
Application number, filing date99916479.107.04.1999
[2001/04]
WO1999US07655
Priority number, dateUS19980081006P07.04.1998         Original published format: US 81006 P
[2001/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9951171
Date:14.10.1999
Language:EN
[1999/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1069874
Date:24.01.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.1999
[2001/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1069874
Date:12.01.2005
Language:EN
[2005/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US14.10.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.02.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/28, A61B17/80, A61C8/00
[2003/12]
Former International [2001/04]A61F2/28
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/04]
TitleGerman:Membran mit gewellter Oberfläche zur Führung des Gewebes[2004/27]
English:MEMBRANE WITH TISSUE-GUIDING SURFACE CORRUGATIONS[2001/04]
French:MEMBRANE COMPRENANT DES ONDULATIONS DE SURFACE GUIDANT LES TISSUS[2001/04]
Former [2001/04]MEMBRAME MIT ONDULIERUNG DER OBERFLÄCHE ZUR LEITUNG DES GEWEBES
Entry into regional phase06.11.2000National basic fee paid 
06.11.2000Search fee paid 
06.11.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
06.11.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.11.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
06.11.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/04]
08.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.05.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.10.2004Fee for grant paid
01.10.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
22.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
26.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT12.01.2005
ES12.01.2005
FI12.01.2005
GR12.01.2005
IT12.01.2005
NL12.01.2005
IE07.04.2005
DK12.04.2005
SE12.04.2005
PT12.06.2005
[2008/23]
Former [2008/17]AT12.01.2005
ES12.01.2005
FI12.01.2005
IT12.01.2005
NL12.01.2005
IE07.04.2005
DK12.04.2005
SE12.04.2005
PT12.06.2005
Former [2007/22]AT12.01.2005
ES12.01.2005
FI12.01.2005
NL12.01.2005
IE07.04.2005
DK12.04.2005
SE12.04.2005
Former [2006/25]AT12.01.2005
FI12.01.2005
NL12.01.2005
IE07.04.2005
DK12.04.2005
SE12.04.2005
Former [2006/22]AT12.01.2005
FI12.01.2005
NL12.01.2005
DK12.04.2005
SE12.04.2005
Former [2006/12]AT12.01.2005
FI12.01.2005
DK12.04.2005
SE12.04.2005
Former [2005/51]AT12.01.2005
FI12.01.2005
SE12.04.2005
Former [2005/48]FI12.01.2005
SE12.04.2005
Former [2005/46]FI12.01.2005
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO9807384  (MACROPORE INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4,33-36 * page 1, lines 1-6 * * page 12, line 7 - page 13, line 6 * * page 17, lines 8-12; claims 1,5-8,11-13,15-17,19,20,28-31 * [Y] 5,29,37;
 [Y]US5676699  (GOGOLEWSKI SYLWESTER [CH], et al) [Y] 5 * column 3, lines 38-42 *;
 [Y]DE9115341U  (PATYK) [Y] 29 * page 5 *;
 [YD]US5222987  (JONES MICHAEL E B [GB]) [YD] 37 * columns 1-3; figure 1; claims 1,3,9 *;
 [A]EP0475077  (EXPERIMENTELLE CHIRURGIE LAB [CH]) [A] * the whole document *
International search[A]US5676699  (GOGOLEWSKI SYLWESTER [CH], et al);
 [A]US5222987  (JONES MICHAEL E B [GB]);
 [A]US5455100  (WHITE EUGENE W [US]);
 [A]US5380328  (MORGAN FRANK H [US]);
 [A]US5443483  (KIRSCH AXEL [DE])
by applicantUS3962153
 US5346492
 US5222987
 US5306304
 US5464439
 US4932973
 US5326356