Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1092191

EP1092191 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ONE-TOUCH E-MAIL REPLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.03.2014
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.03.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.04.2014  [2014/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
OpenTV, Inc.
401 East Middlefield Road
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/16]For all designated states
Open TV, INC.
401 East Middlefield Road
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ZDEPSKI, Joel
470 Levin Avenue
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
 [2001/16]
Representative(s)Freeman, Jacqueline Carol , et al
WP Thompson
138 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/49]Freeman, Jacqueline Carol , et al
W.P.Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane
London WC2B 5SQ / GB
Former [2001/16]Freeman, Jacqueline Carol , et al
W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn
London WC1V 7HU / GB
Application number, filing date99916528.508.04.1999
[2001/16]
WO1999US07751
Priority number, dateUS19980081095P08.04.1998         Original published format: US 81095 P
US19980081046P08.04.1998         Original published format: US 81046 P
[2001/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9952036
Date:14.10.1999
Language:EN
[1999/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1092191
Date:18.04.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.1999
[2001/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US14.10.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.04.2004
ClassificationInternational:G06F13/00, G06F17/60, H04N7/16
[2004/21]
Former International [2001/16]G06F13/00, G06F13/12, G06F13/38, G06F15/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/16]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR E-MAIL-BEANTWORTUNG DURCH EINMALIGES BERÜHREN[2001/16]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ONE-TOUCH E-MAIL REPLY[2001/16]
French:SYSTEME ET TECHNIQUE POUR REPONSE IMMEDIATE PAR COURRIER ELECTRONIQUE[2001/16]
Entry into regional phase08.11.2000National basic fee paid 
08.11.2000Search fee paid 
08.11.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
08.11.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.10.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
08.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/16]
21.08.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.02.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.11.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/15]
27.11.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2014/15]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.08.2008
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
22.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
26.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
20.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
26.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
27.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
25.04.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
29.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
26.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
25.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 13
25.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 14
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201315   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH09237234  ;
 [X]US5632018  (OTORII KEIICHI [JP]) [X] 1,10,16-18 * abstract * * column 2, line 10 - line 44 *;
 [A]WO9712486  (BOSTON TECH INC [US]) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * figure 1 *;
 [A]WO9729591  (WOLZIEN THOMAS R [US]) [A] 1-19 * abstract *;
 [A]US5706211  (BELETIC JOHN D [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 1998, no. 01, [X] 1-19 * abstract *
International search[Y]US5632018  (OTORII KEIICHI [JP]);
 [Y]US5706211  (BELETIC JOHN D [US], et al);
 [Y]US5487100  (KANE JOHN R [US]);
 [Y]US5504519  (REMILLARD ROGER [US]);
 [Y]US5283856  (GROSS KEVIN C [US], et al);
 [Y]US5561709  (REMILLARD ROGER [US]);
 [A]US5561708  (REMILLARD ROGER [US]);
 [A]US5671354  (ITO TSUTOMU [JP], et al);
 [A]US5694616  (JOHNSON WILLIAM J [US], et al);
 [A]US5414773  (HANDELMAN DORON [IL]);
 [Y]US5734901  (SIDHU GURSHARAN S [US], et al);
 [A]US5333266  (BOAZ WADE [US], et al)