Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1070443

EP1070443 - STEEL ALLOY SEPARATOR SHEETS AND COPPER/STEEL LAMINATED SHEETS FOR USE IN MANUFACTURING PRINTED CIRCUIT BOARDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.04.2005
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT, PT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
R.E. Service Company, Inc.
400 South Beckman Road
Lodi, CA 95240 / US
[2001/04]
Inventor(s)01 / FRATER, Mark, S.
9556 Springfield Way
Stockton, CA 95212 / US
 [2001/04]
Representative(s)Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer , et al
Ladas & Parry LLP
Dachauerstrasse 37
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/04]Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer , et al
c/o Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date99916559.009.04.1999
[2001/04]
WO1999US07795
Priority number, dateUS1998005826210.04.1998         Original published format: US 58262
US1998018295629.10.1998         Original published format: US 182956
US1998019346117.11.1998         Original published format: US 193461
US1998021034911.12.1998         Original published format: US 210349
[2001/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9953737
Date:21.10.1999
Language:EN
[1999/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1070443
Date:24.01.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.1999
[2001/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1070443
Date:16.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:H05K3/02, H05K3/46, B32B31/00
[2001/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/04]
TitleGerman:TRENNFOLIEN AUS STAHLLEGIERUNG UND KUPFER/STAHL-VERBUNDFOLIEN ZUR ANWENDUNG IN DER HERSTELLUNG VON LEITERPLATTEN[2001/04]
English:STEEL ALLOY SEPARATOR SHEETS AND COPPER/STEEL LAMINATED SHEETS FOR USE IN MANUFACTURING PRINTED CIRCUIT BOARDS[2001/04]
French:TOLES DE SEPARATION EN ALLIAGE D'ACIER ET TOLES STRATIFIEES EN CUIVRE/ACIER UTILISEES DANS LA PRODUCTION DE CARTES DE CIRCUITS IMPRIMES[2001/04]
Entry into regional phase03.11.2000National basic fee paid 
03.11.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
03.11.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.11.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
18.10.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/04]
03.07.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.12.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.04.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.10.2003Fee for grant paid
16.10.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
08.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
15.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT16.06.2004
BE16.06.2004
CH16.06.2004
FI16.06.2004
FR16.06.2004
IT16.06.2004
LI16.06.2004
NL16.06.2004
DK16.09.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
ES27.09.2004
PT16.11.2004
[2008/17]
Former [2006/47]AT16.06.2004
BE16.06.2004
CH16.06.2004
FI16.06.2004
FR16.06.2004
LI16.06.2004
NL16.06.2004
DK16.09.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
ES27.09.2004
Former [2006/14]AT16.06.2004
BE16.06.2004
CH16.06.2004
FI16.06.2004
FR16.06.2004
LI16.06.2004
DK16.09.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
ES27.09.2004
Former [2005/23]AT16.06.2004
BE16.06.2004
CH16.06.2004
FI16.06.2004
LI16.06.2004
DK16.09.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
ES27.09.2004
Former [2005/22]AT16.06.2004
BE16.06.2004
CH16.06.2004
FI16.06.2004
LI16.06.2004
DK16.09.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
Former [2005/14]AT16.06.2004
BE16.06.2004
CH16.06.2004
FI16.06.2004
LI16.06.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
Former [2005/11]AT16.06.2004
CH16.06.2004
FI16.06.2004
LI16.06.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
Former [2005/06]CH16.06.2004
FI16.06.2004
LI16.06.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
Former [2005/02]CH16.06.2004
FI16.06.2004
LI16.06.2004
SE16.09.2004
Former [2004/52]CH16.06.2004
LI16.06.2004
SE16.09.2004
Former [2004/51]CH16.06.2004
LI16.06.2004
Cited inInternational search[A]DE29719716U  (PICARD FA CARL AUG [DE]) [A] 1,3,4,6,7,9 * claims 1,11,14,15 *;
 [A]DE4116543  (SIEMENS NIXDORF INF SYST [DE]) [A] 1,3 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0411142  (FANUC LTD [JP]) [A] 10,11,13,22,24,26,27,29,30 * column 4, line 27 - line 54 *;
 [DA]US5153050  (JOHNSTON JAMES A [US]) [DA] 10,11,13,22,24,26 * claim - *;
 [A]GB1217104  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 22,27 * the whole document *;
 [PX]EP0872301  (MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO [JP]) [PX] 10,11,13,22,24,26 * claim - *
 [A]  - PH. E. HINTON, "The high-yield challenge in laminating MLBs", ELECTRONIC PACKAGING AND PRODUCTION., MASSACHUSETTS US, (199001), vol. 30, no. 1, pages 56 - 61, XP000096286 [A] 1 * page 61, column M *