Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1068706

EP1068706 - SYSTEM, DEVICE AND METHOD FOR IMPROVING A DEFINED PROPERTY OF TRANSFORM-DOMAIN SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.03.2004
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.03.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.05.2004  [2004/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MOTOROLA, INC.
1303 East Algonquin Road
Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US
[2001/03]
Inventor(s)01 / KSCHISCHANG, Frank, Robert
1998 Hartland Drive
Mississauga, Ontario L5J 1M6 / CA
02 / NARULA, Aradhana
290 Grove Street 7
Auburndale, MA 02166 / US
03 / YANG, Jian
43 Colonial Drive
Mansfield, MA 02048 / US
 [2001/03]
Representative(s)Treleven, Colin , et al
Motorola
European Intellectual Property Operations
Midpoint, Alencon Link
Basingstoke
Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/03]Treleven, Colin , et al
Motorola European Intellectual Property Operations, Midpoint, Alencon Link
Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB
Application number, filing date99916577.209.04.1999
[2001/03]
WO1999US07840
Priority number, dateUS1998005867110.04.1998         Original published format: US 58671
US1998008717729.05.1998         Original published format: US 87177
[2001/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9953662
Date:21.10.1999
Language:EN
[1999/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1068706
Date:17.01.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.1999
[2001/03]
Search report(s)International search reportUS21.10.1999
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP26.07.2001
ClassificationInternational:H04L27/04, H04L27/26
[2001/37]
Former International [2001/03]H04L27/04
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2001/03]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM, EINRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG EINER BESTIMMTEN EIGENSCHAFT EINES SIGNALES IM TRANSFORMBEREICH[2001/03]
English:SYSTEM, DEVICE AND METHOD FOR IMPROVING A DEFINED PROPERTY OF TRANSFORM-DOMAIN SIGNALS[2001/03]
French:SYSTEME, DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE VISANT A AMELIORER UNE PROPRIETE DEFINIE DE SIGNAUX DU DOMAINE DES TRANSFORMEES[2001/03]
Entry into regional phase10.11.2000National basic fee paid 
10.11.2000Search fee paid 
10.11.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
10.11.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.11.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
10.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/03]
01.11.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/20]
11.12.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
08.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200305   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[E]EP0942566  (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [E] 1 * column 2, line 35 - column 3, line 30 * * column 4, line 39 - column 6, line 35 * * column 9, line 17 - column 9, line 35; figure 6 *
 [X]  FRIESE M, "OFDM SIGNALS WITH LOW CREST-FACTOR", GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE (GLOBECOM),US,NEW YORK, IEEE, (19971103), ISBN 0-7803-4199-6, pages 290 - 294, XP000737552 [X] 1 * the whole document *
 [A]  EETVELT VAN P W J ET AL, "THE DISTRIBUTION OF PEAK FACTOR IN QPSK MULTI-CARRIER MODULATION", WIRELESS PERSONAL COMMUNICATIONS,NL,KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, (1995), vol. 2, no. 1/02, ISSN 0929-6212, pages 87 - 96, XP000589613 [A] 1 * abstract * * page 62 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01099531
 [A]  MUELLER S H ET AL, "OFDM WITH REDUCED PEAK-TO-AVERAGE POWER RATIO BY MULTIPLE SIGNAL REPRESENTATION REDUCTION DU FACTEUR DE CRETE EN OFDM PAR REPRESENTATION MULTIPLE DU SIGNAL", ANNALES DES TELECOMMUNICATIONS - ANNALS OF TELECOMMUNICATIONS,PRESSES POLYTECHNIQUES ET UNIVERSITAIRES ROMANDES, LAUSANNE,CH, (199702), vol. 52, no. 1/02, ISSN 0003-4347, pages 58 - 67, XP000991143 [A] 1 * the whole document *
International search[A]US5479447  (CHOW PETER S [US], et al)
 [X]  - MUELLER S H, HUBER J B, "A COMPARISON OF PEAK POWER REDUCTION SCHEMES FOR OFDM", IEEE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE. PHOENIX, ARIZONA, NOV. 3 - 8, 1997, NEW YORK, IEEE., US, US, (19971101), vol. 01, ISBN 978-0-7803-4199-9, pages 01 - 05, XP002921471