Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1066275

EP1066275 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING AN OXIRANE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2001/02]ERERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG INES
[2001/49]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.07.2003
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 02.12.2009  [2009/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SOLVAY (Société Anonyme)
Rue du Prince Albert, 33
1050 Bruxelles / BE
[2001/02]
Inventor(s)01 / CATINAT, Jean-Pierre
Rue de la Résistance 93
B-7131 Waudrez / BE
02 / STREBELLE, Michel
Rue Sombre 84
B-1150 Bruxelles / BE
 [2001/02]
Representative(s)Vande Gucht, Anne , et al
Solvay S.A.
Département de la Propriété Industrielle
Rue de Ransbeek, 310
1120 Bruxelles / BE
[N/P]
Former [2009/49]Vande Gucht, Anne , et al
Solvay S.A. Département de la Propriété Industrielle Rue de Ransbeek, 310
1120 Bruxelles / BE
Former [2001/02]Vande Gucht, Anne , et al
Solvay S.A. 310, rue de Ransbeek
B-1120 Bruxelles / BE
Application number, filing date99916873.520.03.1999
[2001/02]
WO1999EP01956
Priority number, dateBE1998000023224.03.1998         Original published format: BE 9800232
[2001/02]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9948883
Date:30.09.1999
Language:FR
[1999/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1066275
Date:10.01.2001
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.1999
[2001/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1066275
Date:04.09.2002
Language:FR
[2002/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.09.1999
ClassificationInternational:C07D301/12, C07D301/32
[2001/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/02]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES OXIRANES[2001/02]
English:PROCESS FOR PREPARING AN OXIRANE[2001/49]
French:PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN OXIRANNE[2001/02]
Former [2001/02]ERERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG INES
Entry into regional phase24.10.2000National basic fee paid 
24.10.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
24.10.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.10.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
24.10.2000Examination requested  [2001/02]
20.11.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.07.2002Fee for grant paid
01.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT04.09.2002
FI04.09.2002
GR04.09.2002
IE04.09.2002
DK04.12.2002
SE04.12.2002
PT13.12.2002
CY20.03.2003
LU20.03.2003
CH31.03.2003
LI31.03.2003
MC31.03.2003
[2007/22]
Former [2005/02]AT04.09.2002
FI04.09.2002
GR04.09.2002
IE04.09.2002
SE04.12.2002
PT13.12.2002
CY20.03.2003
LU20.03.2003
CH31.03.2003
LI31.03.2003
MC31.03.2003
Former [2004/44]AT04.09.2002
FI04.09.2002
GR04.09.2002
IE04.09.2002
SE04.12.2002
PT13.12.2002
CY20.03.2003
LU20.03.2003
CH31.03.2003
LI31.03.2003
Former [2004/39]AT04.09.2002
FI04.09.2002
GR04.09.2002
IE04.09.2002
SE04.12.2002
PT13.12.2002
LU20.03.2003
CH31.03.2003
LI31.03.2003
Former [2004/22]AT04.09.2002
FI04.09.2002
GR04.09.2002
IE04.09.2002
SE04.12.2002
PT13.12.2002
CH31.03.2003
LI31.03.2003
Former [2003/42]AT04.09.2002
FI04.09.2002
GR04.09.2002
IE04.09.2002
SE04.12.2002
PT13.12.2002
Former [2003/31]AT04.09.2002
FI04.09.2002
GR04.09.2002
SE04.12.2002
PT13.12.2002
Former [2003/22]FI04.09.2002
GR04.09.2002
SE04.12.2002
PT13.12.2002
Former [2003/20]FI04.09.2002
GR04.09.2002
SE04.12.2002
Former [2003/14]FI04.09.2002
SE04.12.2002
Cited inInternational search[DA]EP0230949  (ENIRICERCHE SPA [IT], et al) [DA] 1-11 * the whole document *