Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1077554

EP1077554 - RANDOMIZATION-ENCRYPTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.09.2005
Database last updated on 09.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT, PT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Etechnaf, S.L.
C. Senieta no. 3, Esc. B 2o 1a
43540 Sant Carles de la Rapita / ES
[2004/50]
Former [2001/08]For all designated states
Ferre Herrero, Angel José
Avenida Constitucio 3 bis, 3.
43540 Sant Carles de la Rapita / ES
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2001/08]
Representative(s)Ponti Sales, Adelaida , et al
Oficina Ponti
C. Consell de Cent, 322
08007 Barcelona / ES
[N/P]
Former [2001/08]Ponti Sales, Adelaida , et al
Oficina Ponti C. Consell de Cent, 322
08007 Barcelona / ES
Application number, filing date99916929.530.04.1999
[2001/08]
WO1999ES00115
Priority number, dateES1998000103707.05.1998         Original published format: ES 9801037
ES1998000139822.06.1998         Original published format: ES 9801398
[2001/08]
Filing languageES
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9957845
Date:11.11.1999
Language:EN
[1999/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1077554
Date:21.02.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.1999
[2001/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1077554
Date:17.11.2004
Language:EN
[2004/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:ES11.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04L9/06
[2004/19]
Former International [2001/08]H04L9/20, H04L9/28
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/08]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERSCHLEIERUNG UND VERSCHLÜSSELUNG[2001/08]
English:RANDOMIZATION-ENCRYPTION SYSTEM[2001/08]
French:SYSTEME DE REPARTITION AU HASARD ET DE CRYPTAGE[2001/08]
Entry into regional phase29.11.2000Translation filed 
29.11.2000National basic fee paid 
29.11.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
29.11.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.11.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
29.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/08]
10.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.05.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.07.2004Fee for grant paid
30.07.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.08.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
11.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
11.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
15.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT17.11.2004
BE17.11.2004
CH17.11.2004
FI17.11.2004
FR17.11.2004
IT17.11.2004
LI17.11.2004
NL17.11.2004
DK17.02.2005
GR17.02.2005
SE17.02.2005
DE18.02.2005
ES28.02.2005
PT17.04.2005
GB30.04.2005
LU30.04.2005
MC30.04.2005
IE02.05.2005
[2008/17]
Former [2007/31]AT17.11.2004
BE17.11.2004
CH17.11.2004
FI17.11.2004
FR17.11.2004
LI17.11.2004
NL17.11.2004
DK17.02.2005
GR17.02.2005
SE17.02.2005
DE18.02.2005
ES28.02.2005
GB30.04.2005
LU30.04.2005
MC30.04.2005
IE02.05.2005
Former [2007/22]AT17.11.2004
BE17.11.2004
CH17.11.2004
FI17.11.2004
FR17.11.2004
LI17.11.2004
NL17.11.2004
DK17.02.2005
GR17.02.2005
SE17.02.2005
DE18.02.2005
ES28.02.2005
GB30.04.2005
LU30.04.2005
IE02.05.2005
Former [2006/32]AT17.11.2004
BE17.11.2004
CH17.11.2004
FI17.11.2004
FR17.11.2004
LI17.11.2004
NL17.11.2004
DK17.02.2005
GR17.02.2005
DE18.02.2005
ES28.02.2005
GB30.04.2005
IE02.05.2005
Former [2006/25]AT17.11.2004
BE17.11.2004
CH17.11.2004
FI17.11.2004
LI17.11.2004
NL17.11.2004
DK17.02.2005
GR17.02.2005
DE18.02.2005
ES28.02.2005
GB30.04.2005
IE02.05.2005
Former [2006/13]AT17.11.2004
BE17.11.2004
CH17.11.2004
FI17.11.2004
LI17.11.2004
NL17.11.2004
DK17.02.2005
GR17.02.2005
DE18.02.2005
ES28.02.2005
GB30.04.2005
Former [2005/51]AT17.11.2004
BE17.11.2004
CH17.11.2004
FI17.11.2004
LI17.11.2004
DK17.02.2005
GR17.02.2005
ES28.02.2005
Former [2005/46]AT17.11.2004
CH17.11.2004
FI17.11.2004
LI17.11.2004
DK17.02.2005
GR17.02.2005
ES28.02.2005
Former [2005/36]AT17.11.2004
CH17.11.2004
FI17.11.2004
LI17.11.2004
GR17.02.2005
ES28.02.2005
Former [2005/27]CH17.11.2004
FI17.11.2004
LI17.11.2004
GR17.02.2005
ES28.02.2005
Former [2005/26]CH17.11.2004
FI17.11.2004
LI17.11.2004
GR17.02.2005
Former [2005/25]CH17.11.2004
FI17.11.2004
LI17.11.2004
Former [2005/24]FI17.11.2004
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9633564  (SECURE COMPUTING CORP [US]);
 [A]EP0877509  (IBM [US]);
 [A]US5479513  (PROTOPOPESCU VLADIMIR A [US], et al);
 [A]EP0635956  (CANON KK [JP]);
 [A]EP0467239  (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]);
 [A]US3798360  (FEISTEL H)
Examination US5214703