EP1001477 - SOLID ELECTROLYTIC SECONDARY BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.2010 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | ||
Former [2000/20] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HATAZAWA, Tsuyonobu Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 02 /
KONDO, Takayuki Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 03 /
IIJIMA, Yukiko Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [2000/20] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/20] | MÜLLER & HOFFMANN Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99917115.0 | 22.04.1999 | [2000/20] | WO1999JP02156 | Priority number, date | JP19980117551 | 27.04.1998 Original published format: JP 11755198 | [2000/20] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9956337 | Date: | 04.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1001477 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1001477 | Date: | 16.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.11.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/40, H01M4/02, C08G65/32 | [2005/13] | CPC: |
H01M10/0565 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/058 (KR);
H01M10/0525 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02P70/50 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/20] | H01M10/40, H01M4/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2000/20] | Title | German: | SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE MIT FESTEM ELEKTROLYTEN | [2000/20] | English: | SOLID ELECTROLYTIC SECONDARY BATTERY | [2000/20] | French: | ACCUMULATEUR ELECTRIQUE A ELECTROLYTE SOLIDE | [2000/20] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.1999 | Translation filed | 23.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.1999 | Search fee paid | 23.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/20] | 12.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0730316 (ATOCHEM NORTH AMERICA ELF [US]) [Y] 1-9* page 6, line 7 - line 47; claims 4,5; tables II,III *; | [Y]US5565284 (KOGA KEIJI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-9 * column 5, line 43 - line 53; claims 1,7,8 *; | [E]EP1011165 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [E] 1-9 * page 4, line 44 - page 9, line 21; claims 4,5 * | International search | [XP]JPH0113729 ; | [X]JPH06243896 (TDK CORP); | [X]JPH08250127 (ATOCHEM NORTH AMERICA ELF); | [Y]JPH09115550 (YUASA BATTERY CO LTD); | [Y]JPH09306544 (TOSHIBA CORP, et al); | [XP]JPH1167274 (DAIKIN IND LTD); | [XE]JPH11111265 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) | by applicant | EP0633618 | EP0730316 | US5565284 | EP1011165 |