Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1084939

EP1084939 - SUSPENSION SUPPORTING MEMBER FOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.07.2004
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.07.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 15.09.2004  [2004/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, Minami Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 107-8556 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/12]For all designated states
Honda Giken Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha
1-1, Minami Aoyama 2-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 107-8556 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / IWATSUKI, Shuichiro, K.K. Honda GijutsuKenkyusho
4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi
Saitama 351-0193 / JP
 [2001/12]
Representative(s)Hague, Alison Jane
Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/12]Hague, Alison Jane
Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Application number, filing date99917218.228.04.1999
[2001/12]
WO1999JP02287
Priority number, dateJP1998012769211.05.1998         Original published format: JP 12769298
[2001/12]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9958391
Date:18.11.1999
Language:EN
[1999/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1084939
Date:21.03.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.1999
[2001/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1084939
Date:24.09.2003
Language:EN
[2003/39]
Search report(s)International search reportJP18.11.1999
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP25.09.2001
ClassificationInternational:B62D25/20, B60G7/00
[2001/12]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/12]
TitleGerman:HALTERUNG FÜR RADAUFHÄNGUNG FÜR FAHRZEUGE[2001/12]
English:SUSPENSION SUPPORTING MEMBER FOR VEHICLE[2001/12]
French:ELEMENT SERVANT A SUPPORTER LA SUSPENSION D'UN VEHICULE[2001/12]
Entry into regional phase30.11.2000Translation filed 
30.11.2000National basic fee paid 
30.11.2000Search fee paid 
30.11.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
30.11.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.11.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
30.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/12]
27.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.09.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.03.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.07.2003Fee for grant paid
25.07.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.06.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
29.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
28.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5431363  (EZZAT HESHAM A [US], et al) [Y] 1-3 * abstract * * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 19 * * column 2, line 38 - line 47 *;
 [Y]DE19624242  (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [Y] 1-3 * column A; figure 1 *;
 [A]US5383987  (KREIS GUNDOLF [DE], et al) [A] 1,3 * figure . * * column 4, line 42 - line 59 *;
 [A]US5456517  (KALIAN ARIANNA [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * column A; figure -; claims 1-4 * * column 1, line 55 - line 20 *
International search[Y]JPS639088U  ;
 [Y]JPH01161984U  ;
 [Y]JPH1067339  (PORSCHE AG)