Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1073337

EP1073337 - IMPROVEMENTS IN HERBICIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.12.2005
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Organic Interceptor Products Limited
102 Sealey Street
Thames / NZ
[2005/08]
Former [2001/06]For all designated states
Organic Interceptor Products Limited
10 College Hill
Ponsonby 1001 / NZ
Inventor(s)01 / INNES, Rodney, Mitchell
'Innes Heights', 25 State Highway
Te Kouma 2851 / NZ
 [2001/06]
Representative(s)Lees, Kate Jane , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
Tower Building
Water Street
Liverpool
L3 1BA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/35]Lees, Kate Jane , et al
Marks & Clerk Tower Building Water Street
Liverpool L3 1BA / GB
Former [2001/06]Lees, Kate Jane , et al
Roystons, Tower Building, Water Street
Liverpool L3 1BA / GB
Application number, filing date99917257.021.04.1999
[2001/06]
WO1999NZ00047
Priority number, dateNZ1998033028321.04.1998         Original published format: NZ 33028398
[2001/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9953764
Date:28.10.1999
Language:EN
[1999/43]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1073337
Date:07.02.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.1999
[2001/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1073337
Date:23.02.2005
Language:EN
[2005/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:A01N65/00, A01N31/04, A01N31/06, A01N31/02
[2001/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/06]
TitleGerman:VERBESSERUNGEN BEI HERBIZIDEN[2001/06]
English:IMPROVEMENTS IN HERBICIDES[2001/06]
French:AMELIORATIONS APPORTEES A DES HERBICIDES[2001/06]
Entry into regional phase18.10.2000National basic fee paid 
18.10.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
18.10.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.11.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
19.10.2000Examination requested  [2001/06]
11.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.02.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
30.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.08.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.12.2004Fee for grant paid
16.12.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.11.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/07]
Request for further processing for:30.04.2003Request for further processing filed
25.04.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
22.05.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
14.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
28.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
28.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200204   M06   Fee paid on   14.08.2002
30.04.200305   M06   Fee paid on   28.10.2003
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT23.02.2005
FI23.02.2005
FR23.02.2005
IT23.02.2005
NL23.02.2005
DK23.05.2005
SE23.05.2005
DE24.05.2005
ES03.06.2005
PT03.08.2005
[2008/17]
Former [2006/31]AT23.02.2005
FI23.02.2005
FR23.02.2005
NL23.02.2005
DK23.05.2005
SE23.05.2005
DE24.05.2005
ES03.06.2005
PT03.08.2005
Former [2006/18]AT23.02.2005
FI23.02.2005
NL23.02.2005
DK23.05.2005
SE23.05.2005
DE24.05.2005
ES03.06.2005
PT03.08.2005
Former [2006/14]AT23.02.2005
FI23.02.2005
NL23.02.2005
DK23.05.2005
SE23.05.2005
ES03.06.2005
PT03.08.2005
Former [2006/12]AT23.02.2005
FI23.02.2005
DK23.05.2005
SE23.05.2005
ES03.06.2005
Former [2005/51]AT23.02.2005
FI23.02.2005
SE23.05.2005
Former [2005/48]FI23.02.2005
SE23.05.2005
Former [2005/46]FI23.02.2005
Cited inInternational search[PX]WO9831223  (ACTION PIN) [PX] 1-46;
 [X]WO9105472  (SAFER, INC.) [X] 1-46;
 [X]AU7421096  (ERROLL M PULLEN ET AL) [X] 1-46;
 [X]WO9616549  (ACTION PIN) [X] 1-46;
 [X]CA1153267  (AMERICAN CYANAMID COMPANY) [X] 1-33,44;
 [X]GB1464716  (JEYES U.K. LIMITED) [X] 1-22,33,44;
 [X]BE1002598  (BIOLISSA S.C.) [X] 1-22,33,44;
 [A]WO9716975  (SELGA, JOHN ET AL) [A] 1-46;
 [A]EP0617888  (W. NEUDORFF GMBH KG) [A] 1-46