blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0995261 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0995261



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 142
29.12.2006 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
12.01.2006 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
13.12.2005 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
12.12.2005 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
12.12.2005 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
12.12.2005 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
09.12.2005 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
09.12.2005 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
09.12.2005 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
23.11.2005 Request for change of address Search / examination 1
04.08.2005 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
04.08.2005 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
04.08.2005 Text intended for grant Search / examination 19
24.03.2005 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
22.12.2004 Claims Search / examination 3
22.12.2004 Description Search / examination 1
22.12.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
20.12.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
14.10.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
13.10.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
07.10.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
11.06.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
11.06.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.04.2004 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
18.02.2004 General enquiry Search / examination 1
12.12.2001 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
19.10.2001 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
16.10.2001 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
16.10.2001 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
16.10.2001 European search report Search / examination 1
19.09.2001 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
17.09.2001 Fax filed during the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
22.02.2001 Communication of expected date of establishment of search report Search / examination 1
19.01.2001 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
15.03.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
10.01.2000 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
10.01.2000 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
04.01.2000 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
04.01.2000 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
27.10.1999 Priority document Search / examination 26
22.10.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
14.10.1999 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
14.10.1999 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 21