blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0995261


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
29.12.2006 No opposition filed within time limit published on  31.01.2007  [2007/05]
06.01.2006 (Expected) grant published on  22.02.2006  [2006/08]
17.12.2005 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
17.12.2005 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
09.12.2005 Change - applicant published on  25.01.2006  [2006/04]
27.07.2005 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
30.04.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.12.2004 New entry: Reply to examination report
12.10.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
11.06.2004 First examination report
07.06.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
05.05.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.05.2003 Renewal fee
07.05.2002 Renewal fee
12.10.2001 Supplementary search report published on  28.11.2001 [2001/48]
12.10.2001 Change - classification published on  28.11.2001 [2001/48]
04.05.2001 Renewal fee
10.03.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  26.04.2000 [2000/17]
10.03.2000 Request for examination filed published on  26.04.2000 [2000/17]
11.02.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
20.01.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
13.01.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
09.11.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
26.10.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
18.10.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
01.06.1999 PCT data prior to European publication