blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0995261
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0995261Global Dossier 22.02.2006B1
EP0995261 28.11.2001A4
EP0995261 26.04.2000A1
Priority number Date
US9907647 07.04.1999
US5738098 08.04.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR9906347 19.09.2000A
Priority number Date
US9907647 07.04.1999
US5738098 08.04.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2293241 06.08.2002C
CA2293241 14.10.1999A1
Priority number Date
US9907647 07.04.1999
US5738098 08.04.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69929964T 23.11.2006T2
DE69929964D 27.04.2006D1
Priority number Date
US9907647 07.04.1999
US5738098 08.04.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9952204Global Dossier 14.10.1999A1
Priority number Date
US5738098 08.04.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR100371083B 05.02.2003B1
KR20010013533 26.02.2001A
Priority number Date
US5738098 08.04.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6028477 22.02.2000A
Priority number Date
US5738098 08.04.1998