blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0995261

Designated contracting states DE 
 FI 
 FR 
 GB 
 SE 
Examination procedure09.12.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Entry into regional phase06.01.2000National basic fee paid 
06.01.2000Search fee paid 
06.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
06.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
22.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
26.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
20.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
European patent granted22.02.2006
Opposition procedure23.11.2006No opposition filed within time limit published on 31.01.2007 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:26.04.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):DE FI FR GB SE
 
Event date:26.04.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20000106
 
Event date:28.11.2001 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A4
Designated State(s):DE FI FR GB SE
 
Event date:28.11.2001 
Event description:SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20011016
 
Event date:28.11.2001 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
Free Format Text:7H 03F 1/26 A, 7H 03F 1/34 B, 7H 03F 1/32 B
 
Event date:28.07.2004 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20040611
 
Event date:25.01.2006 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:POWERWAVE TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
 
Event date:22.02.2006 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):DE FI FR GB SE
 
Event date:22.02.2006 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:27.04.2006 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69929964
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20060427
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:13.06.2006 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE TRGR
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT
 
Event date:20.10.2006 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:31.01.2007 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20061123
 
Event date:20.02.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 69929964 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE ULLRICH & NAUMANN P, DE
 
Event date:02.04.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 69929964 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE ULLRICH & NAUMANN P, DE
Effective DATE:20150220
 
Event date:02.04.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 69929964 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
Owner Name:INTEL CORPORATION (A DELAWARE CORPORATION), SA, US
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: POWERWAVE TECHNOLOGIES, INC., SANTA ANA, CALIF., US
Effective DATE:20150220
 
Event date:24.04.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR TP
Code Expl.: TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY
Owner Name:INTEL CORPORATION, US
Effective DATE:20150323
 
Event date:27.05.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB 732E
Code Expl.: AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)
Free Format Text:REGISTERED BETWEEN 20150501 AND 20150506
 
Event date:03.06.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB 732E
Code Expl.: AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)
Free Format Text:REGISTERED BETWEEN 20150507 AND 20150513
 
Event date:23.03.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:27.03.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:27.03.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.04.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20180329
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.05.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20180327
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.07.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Payment DATE:20180410
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.07.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20180327
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:28.09.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Payment DATE:20180411
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:07.04.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R071 69929964 DE
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY OF RIGHT
 
Event date:01.05.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB PE20
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS
Expiry DATE:20190406
 
Event date:28.05.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE EUG
Code Expl.:-EP PATENT HAS LAPSED