Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0995261

EP0995261 - ADAPTIVE BIASING IN A POWER AMPLIFIER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.12.2006
Database last updated on 23.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.12.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 31.01.2007  [2007/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Powerwave Technologies, Inc.
1801 E. St. Andrew Place
Santa Ana, CA 92705 / US
[2006/04]
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
Powerwave Technologies, Inc.
2026 McGaw Avenue
Irvine, California 92614 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GENTZLER, Charles, R.
1432 Corte de Primavera
Thousand Oaks, CA 91360 / US
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Blatchford, William Michael , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London
SE1 2AU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]Blatchford, William Michael , et al
Withers & Rogers Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
Application number, filing date99917362.807.04.1999
[2000/17]
WO1999US07647
Priority number, dateUS1998005738008.04.1998         Original published format: US 57380
[2000/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9952204
Date:14.10.1999
Language:EN
[1999/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0995261
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.1999
[2000/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0995261
Date:22.02.2006
Language:EN
[2006/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US14.10.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.10.2001
ClassificationInternational:H03F1/26, H03F1/34, H03F1/32
[2001/48]
Former International [2000/17]H03F1/26
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   SE [2000/17]
TitleGerman:ADAPTIVE VORSPANNUNGSEINSTELLUNG IN EINEM LEISTUNGSVERSTÄRKER[2000/17]
English:ADAPTIVE BIASING IN A POWER AMPLIFIER[2000/17]
French:POLARISATION ADAPTATIVE DANS UN AMPLIFICATEUR DE PUISSANCE[2000/17]
Entry into regional phase06.01.2000National basic fee paid 
06.01.2000Search fee paid 
06.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
06.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/17]
11.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.08.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.12.2005Fee for grant paid
09.12.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.11.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
22.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
26.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
20.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]US5621354  (MITZLAFF JAMES E);
 [A]EP0367458  (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH)
International search[X]US5594385