Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1053575

EP1053575 - TEMPERATURE COMPENSATION OF LASER DIODES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.07.2005
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip29.07.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.09.2005  [2005/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NGK Insulators, Ltd.
2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku
Nagoya 467 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2003/31]For all designated states
NGK INSULATORS, LTD.
2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku
Nagoya 467 / JP
Former [2000/47]For all designated states
Optobahn Corporation
Suite A, 970 Knox Street
Torrance, CA 90502 / US
For all designated states
NGK INSULATORS, LTD.
2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku
Nagoya 467 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / UCHIDA, Toshi, K.
30970 Via La Cresta
Rancho Palos Verdes, CA 90275 / US
[2000/47]
Representative(s)Paget, Hugh Charles Edward
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/47]Paget, Hugh Charles Edward
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date99917477.413.04.1999
[2000/47]
WO1999US08116
Priority number, dateUS1998006039014.04.1998         Original published format: US 60390
[2000/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9953577
Date:21.10.1999
Language:EN
[1999/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1053575
Date:22.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.1999
[2000/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1053575
Date:22.09.2004
Language:EN
[2004/39]
Search report(s)International search reportUS21.10.1999
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP07.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01S3/00, H01S5/068
[2000/47]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/47]
TitleGerman:TEMPERATURKOMPENSATION VON LASERDIODEN[2000/47]
English:TEMPERATURE COMPENSATION OF LASER DIODES[2000/47]
French:CORRECTEUR DE TEMPERATURE DE DIODES LASER[2000/47]
Entry into regional phase05.01.2000National basic fee paid 
05.01.2000Search fee paid 
05.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
05.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.08.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
05.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/47]
02.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.02.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.07.2004Fee for grant paid
16.07.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.06.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
23.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
23.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5708673  (IKEUCHI TADASHI [JP]) [X] 1-10 * column 7, lines 6-66; figure 6 * [Y] 1,4,5,10;
 [Y]DE3508034  (ANT NACHRICHTENTECH [DE]) [Y] 1,4,10 * abstract *;
 [A]JPH05129702  ;
 [A]JPH01114091  ;
 [A]JPS5917291  ;
 [A]JPS595685
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930910), vol. 017, no. 504, Database accession no. (E - 1430), [A] 1,4,10 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890808), vol. 013, no. 354, Database accession no. (E - 802), [A] 1,4,10 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840510), vol. 008, no. 099, Database accession no. (E - 243), [A] 1,5 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840418), vol. 008, no. 084, Database accession no. (E - 239), [A] 1,9,10 * abstract *
International search[A]US4243952  (PATTERSON DAVID R);
 [AP]US5761230  (OONO HIROSHI [JP], et al);
 [AP]US5760939  (NAGARAJAN RADHAKRISHNAN [US], et al)