EP1012390 - METHOD OF DETERMINING A VOLUMETRIC PERCENTAGE OF AIR IN A FIBER SUSPENSION IN A PAPER-MAKING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.05.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Sulzer Paper Technology North America, Inc. 2620 E. Glendale Avenue Appleton, WI 54913-2337 / US | [2000/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRAF, Edwin, X. N. 8662 Firelane 9 Menasha, WI 54952 / US | [2000/26] | Representative(s) | Morgan, James Garnet Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Morgan, James Garnet Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/26] | Morgan, James G. Robert-Koch-Strasse 1 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99917482.4 | 14.04.1999 | [2000/26] | WO1999US08135 | Priority number, date | US19980061300 | 16.04.1998 Original published format: US 61300 | [2000/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9953137 | Date: | 21.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1012390 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | D21F11/00, G01F5/00 | [2000/26] | CPC: |
D21G9/00 (EP,US);
D21D5/26 (EP,US);
D21F1/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FI, SE [2000/26] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DES VOLUMETRISCHEN PROZENTSATZES VON LUFT IN EINER FASERAUFSCHWEMMUNG IN EINER PAPIERMASCHINE | [2000/26] | English: | METHOD OF DETERMINING A VOLUMETRIC PERCENTAGE OF AIR IN A FIBER SUSPENSION IN A PAPER-MAKING MACHINE | [2000/26] | French: | PROCEDE POUR DETERMINER UN POURCENTAGE VOLUMETRIQUE D'AIR DANS UNE SUSPENSION DE FIBRES POUR MACHINE DE FABRICATION DU PAPIER | [2000/26] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.1999 | Search fee paid | 14.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.1999 | Examination requested [2000/26] | 31.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/26] | 15.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5621161 (LEYSE ROBERT H [US]); | [A]USH608H ; | [A]US3246516 (NICHOLAS MAROPIS); | [A]US3654072 (MASSA FRANK) |