Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1094836

EP1094836 - METHODS OF RAISING ANIMALS FOR MEAT PRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.05.2006
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.05.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 14.06.2006  [2006/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MetaMorphix International, Inc.
1450 South Rolling Road
Baltimore, Maryland 21227 / US
[2002/29]
Former [2001/18]For all designated states
BIOSTAR INC.
343-111 Research Drive
Saskatoon, Saskatchewan S7N 3R2 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / MANNS, Jack G.
11 Pony Trail Road, Riverside Estate
Saskatoon, Saskatchewan S7T 1A1 / CA
02 / ACRES, Stephen D.
820 University Drive
Saskatoon, Saskatchewan S7N 0J6 / CA
03 / HARLAND, Richard
514 Bate Crescent
Saskatoon, Saskatchewan S7H 3A7 / CA
 [2001/18]
Representative(s)Harding, Charles Thomas
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/18]Harding, Charles Thomas
D. Young & Co. 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date99917704.105.05.1999
[2001/18]
WO1999CA00360
Priority number, dateUS19980084217P05.05.1998         Original published format: US 84217 P
[2001/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9956771
Date:11.11.1999
Language:EN
[1999/45]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1094836
Date:02.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.1999
[2001/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.02.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61K39/00, A61K39/385, // C12N15/62, C07K19/00
[2001/18]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/18]
Extension statesAL24.11.2000
LT24.11.2000
LV24.11.2000
MK24.11.2000
RO24.11.2000
SI24.11.2000
TitleGerman:METHODEN ZUR ZÜCHTUNG VON TIEREN FÜR DIE FLEISCHPRODUKTION[2001/18]
English:METHODS OF RAISING ANIMALS FOR MEAT PRODUCTION[2001/18]
French:PROCEDES D'ELEVAGE D'ANIMAUX POUR LA PRODUCTION DE VIANDE[2001/18]
Entry into regional phase24.11.2000National basic fee paid 
24.11.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
24.11.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.10.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
24.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/18]
17.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.03.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.12.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/24]
04.01.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2006/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
14.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
18.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200305   M06   Fee paid on   30.10.2003
31.05.200406   M06   Fee paid on   18.06.2004
31.05.200507   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[DY]WO9624675  (UNIV SASKATCHEWAN [CA]) [DY] 4,8-10,17,18,20-28 * page 20, line 27 - page 21, line 18; examples 7,8; claim - * * page 33, line 3 - line 7 * * page 53, line 1 - page 54, line 14 *;
 [DA]EP0501882  (RHONE MERIEUX [FR]) [DA] 1-28 * page 3, line 32 - page 4, line 2; claim - *
 [XY]  - M. FINNERTY ET AL., "IMMUNIZATION OF BULL CALVES WITH A GnRH ANALOGUE-HUMAN SERUM ALBUMIN CONJUGATE: EFFECT OF CONJUGATE DOSE, TYPE OF ADJUVANT AND BOOSTER INTERVAL ON IMMUNE, ENDOCRINE, TESTICULAR AND GROWTH RESPONSES.", JOURNAL OF REPRODUCTION AND FERTILITY, OXFORD, GB, (199407), vol. 101, no. 2, pages 333 - 343, XP002122416 [X] 1-3,5-7,11,13-16,19 * page 339, column R, paragraph 4 * * page 341, column R, paragraphs 2,3 * [Y] 4,8-10,17,18,20-28

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1530/jrf.0.1010333
 [DA]  - FALVO R E ET AL, "Effect of active immunization against LHRH or LH in boars: reproductive consequences and performance traits.", DATABASE FSTA, INTERNATIONAL FOOD INFORMATION SERVICE (IFIS), FRANFURT/MAIN, DE, Database accession no. 87-1-03-s0152, XP002122417 [DA] 1-28 * abstract *
    [] - JOURNAL OF ANIMAL SCIENCE, S. Illinois Univ., Carbondale, Illinois 62901, USA, (1986), vol. 63, no. 3, pages 986 - 994,
 [DA]  - R.H. MELOEN ET AL., "EFFICIENT IMMUNOCASTRATION OF MALE PIGLETS BY IMMUNONEUTRALIZATION OF GnRH USING A NEW GnRH-LIKE PEPTIDE.", VACCINE, GUILDFORD, GB, (1994), vol. 12, no. 8, pages 741 - 746, XP000570334 [DA] 1-28 * page 742, column R, paragraph 1 * * page 743, column R, paragraph 1 * * page 745, column L, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0264-410X(94)90226-7