Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1060151

EP1060151 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING ONE OR SEVERAL CRYSTALLIZED CERAMIC THIN LAYERS AND COMPONENT WITH SUCH A LAYER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.04.2004
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 03.09.2008  [2008/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Forschungszentrum Jülich GmbH
52425 Jülich / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/36]For all designated states
Forschungszentrum Jülich GmbH
52425 Jülich / DE
Former [2002/28]For all designated states
Forschungszentrum Jülich GmbH
52425 Jülich / DE
Former [2000/51]For all designated states
FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM JÜLICH GMBH
Wilhelm-Johnen-Strasse
52425 Jülich / DE
Inventor(s)01 / WASER, Rainer
Am Schaafweg 9 a
D-52076 Aachen / DE
02 / HOFFMANN, Susanne
Tittardffeld 104
D-52072 Aachen / DE
03 / BALDUS, Oliver
Klementstrasse 3 a
D-52074 Aachen / DE
04 / SCHUSTER, Andreas
Seestrasse 20se 5
D-52372 Kreuzau / DE
[2000/51]
Application number, filing date99917750.415.02.1999
[2000/51]
WO1999DE00478
Priority number, dateDE199810601316.02.1998         Original published format: DE 19806013
DE1998215601U01.09.1998         Original published format: DE 29815601 U
[2000/51]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9941212
Date:19.08.1999
Language:DE
[1999/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1060151
Date:20.12.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.1999
[2000/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1060151
Date:04.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:C04B35/622, C04B35/64
[2000/51]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/51]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER ODER MEHRERER KRISTALLISIERTER KERAMISCHER DÜNNSCHICHTEN SOWIE BAUELEMENT MIT EINER SOLCHEN SCHICHT[2000/51]
English:METHOD FOR PRODUCING ONE OR SEVERAL CRYSTALLIZED CERAMIC THIN LAYERS AND COMPONENT WITH SUCH A LAYER[2000/51]
French:PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UNE OU DE PLUSIEURS COUCHES MINCES CERAMIQUES CRISTALLISEES, ET COMPOSANT POURVU D'UNE TELLE COUCHE[2000/51]
Entry into regional phase16.08.2000National basic fee paid 
16.08.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
16.08.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.09.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/51]
05.12.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.04.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.02.2003Fee for grant paid
07.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
25.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[X]US5661092  (KOBERSTEIN JEFFREY T [US], et al) [X] 1,3,11,12,14,17 * column 3, line 46 - line 67 * * column 9, line 31 - line 52 * * claims 1,9,10 *