EP1067984 - CATHETER VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.02.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.04.2004 [2004/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schönbächler, Helga Fallsgasse 266 9492 Eschen / LI | [2001/11] |
Former [2001/03] | For all designated states Schönbächler, Helga Fallsgasse 266 9492 Eschen / LI | ||
For all designated states SCHÖNBÄCHLER, Peter Fallsgasse 266 9492 Eschen / LI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/11] |
Former [2001/03] | 01 /
SCHÖNBÄCHLER, Peter Fallsgasse 266 FL-9492 Eschen / LI | Representative(s) | Hasler, Erich, et al c/o Riederer Hasler & Partner Patentanwälte AG Elestastrasse 8 7310 Bad Ragaz / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2001/03] | Hasler, Erich, Dr., et al c/o Riederer Hasler & Partner, Patentanwälte AG, Bahnhofstrasse 10 7310 Bad Ragaz / CH | Application number, filing date | 99917965.8 | 07.04.1999 | [2001/03] | WO1999EP02360 | Priority number, date | EP19980810297 | 07.04.1998 Original published format: EP 98810297 | [2001/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9951298 | Date: | 14.10.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1067984 | Date: | 17.01.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61M39/28, F16K7/06 | [2001/03] | CPC: |
A61M39/284 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2001/03] | Title | German: | KATHETERVENTIL | [2001/03] | English: | CATHETER VALVE | [2001/03] | French: | SOUPAPE DE CATHETER | [2001/03] | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/03] | 11.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/15] | 24.10.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]DE9408633U (MEDINORM AG) [X] 30 * the whole document * [A] 1; | [A]DE19712908 (RUESCH WILLY AG) [A] 1,30 * abstract *; | [DA]DE19543543 (ANGIOMED AG) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP0599471 (SMITHS IND MED SYST INC) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE3324699 (B. BRAUN MELSUNGEN AG) [AD] 1 * the whole document * [A] ; | [DA]EP0150666 (PFISTER LEHMANN ALFRED) [DA] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0307743 (JOKA KATHETERTECHNIK GMBH) [A] 1 * abstract * |