Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1066537

EP1066537 - MR METHODS FOR IMAGING PULMONARY AND CARDIAC VASCULATURE AND EVALUATING BLOOD FLOW USING DISSOLVED POLARIZED ?129 Xe [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.10.2018
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  26.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.11.2018  [2018/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Medi-Physics, Inc.
101 Carnegie Center
Princeton, NJ 08540 / US
[2003/06]
Former [2001/02]For all designated states
Magnetic Imaging Technologies Inc.
Suite 175, 2500 Meridian Parkway
Durham NC 27713 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DRIEHUYS, Bastiaan
3625 Sunningdale Way
Durham, NC 27707 / US
02 / HASSON, Kenton Christopher
Apartment 1827, 4304 Waterford Valley Drive
Durham, NC 27713 / US
03 / BOGORAD, Paul, Lev
230 West Margaret Lane
Hillsborough, NC 27278 / US
 [2001/02]
Representative(s)Bannan, Sally
GE Healthcare Limited Pollards Wood Nightingales Lane Chalfont St Giles
Buckinghamshire HP8 4SP / GB
[2014/19]
Former [2009/51]Canning, Lewis R. , et al
GE Healthcare Limited Amersham Place Little Chalfont
Buckinghamshire HP7 9NA / GB
Former [2008/32]Rollins, Anthony John , et al
GE Healthcare Limited Amersham Place Little Chalfont
Buckinghamshire HP7 9NA / GB
Former [2001/02]Rollins, Anthony John , et al
Nycomed Amersham plc Amersham Labs White Lion Road
Amersham, Bucks. HP7 9LL / GB
Application number, filing date99918429.417.03.1999
[2001/02]
WO1999US05788
Priority number, dateUS19980078384P18.03.1998         Original published format: US 78384 P
[2001/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9947940
Date:23.09.1999
Language:EN
[1999/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1066537
Date:10.01.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.1999
[2001/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.09.1999
ClassificationInternational:G01R33/28
[2001/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/02]
TitleGerman:MAGNETRESONANZVERFAHREN ZUR ABBILDUNG VON LUNGEN- UND HERZGEFÄSSEN UND ZUR BEURTEILUNG DES BLUTFLUSSES UNTER VERWENDUNG VON GELÖSTEM 129XE[2001/02]
English:MR METHODS FOR IMAGING PULMONARY AND CARDIAC VASCULATURE AND EVALUATING BLOOD FLOW USING DISSOLVED POLARIZED ?129 Xe[2001/02]
French:PROCEDE D'IMAGERIE PAR RESONANCE MAGNETIQUE DU SYSTEME CARDIOVASCULAIRE PULMONAIRE ET CARDIAQUE ET D'EVALUATION DU DEBIT SANGUIN AU MOYEN DE ?129 Xe POLARISE DISSOUS[2001/02]
Entry into regional phase13.10.2000National basic fee paid 
13.10.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
13.10.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.09.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.10.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.10.2000Examination requested  [2001/02]
11.12.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
02.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.03.2003Date of oral proceedings
17.04.2003Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
17.04.2003Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
02.10.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/45]
27.06.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2018/45]
Appeal following examination03.06.2003Appeal received No.  T0992/03
15.08.2003Statement of grounds filed
04.11.2010Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure
04.11.2010Date of oral proceedings
20.10.2006Date of oral proceedings
02.11.2006Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)EP02022941.5  / EP1286171
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.12.2001
Request for further processing for:02.12.2002Request for further processing filed
02.12.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.12.2002Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
11.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
15.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
22.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
29.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
28.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
26.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
25.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
28.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 13
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201214   M06   Not yet paid
31.03.201315   M06   Not yet paid
31.03.201416   M06   Not yet paid
31.03.201517   M06   Not yet paid
31.03.201618   M06   Not yet paid
31.03.201719   M06   Not yet paid
31.03.201820   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[YD]WO9527438  (UNIV NEW YORK STATE RES FOUND [US], et al) [YD] 11 * page 7, line 13 - page 9, line 22 * * page 20, line 23 - page 22, line 24 * * page 32, line 4 - page 34, line 10 *;
 [XY]  - JIA-HONG GAO ET AL, "Magnetization and diffusion effects in NMR imaging of hyperpolarized substances", MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, JAN. 1997, WILLIAMS & WILKINS, USA, vol. 37, no. 1, ISSN 0740-3194, pages 153 - 158, XP000749406 [X] 1-10,14,15,21-29,32-37 * see the whole document * [Y] 11-13,16-19,30,31
 [YD]  - MUGLER J P ET AL, "MR IMAGING AND SPECTROSCOPY USING HYPERPOLARIZED 129XE GAS: PRELIMINARY HUMAN RESULTS", MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, (19970601), vol. 37, no. 6, ISSN 0740-3194, pages 809 - 815, XP000655650 [YD] 12,13 * see the whole document *
 [Y]  - CHEN X J ET AL, "MR microscopy of lung airways with hyperpolarized /sup 3/He", MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, JAN. 1998, WILLIAMS & WILKINS, USA, vol. 39, no. 1, ISSN 0740-3194, pages 79 - 84, XP002111039 [Y] 16,17 * see the whole document *
 [Y]  - ZHAO LEI ET AL, "Biomedical imaging using hyperpolarized noble gas MRI: Pulse sequence considerations", 7TH RCNP INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON POLARIZED /SUP 3/HE BEAMS AND GAS TARGETS AND THEIR APPLICATION, KOBE, JAPAN, 20-24 JAN. 1997, Nuclear Instruments & Methods in Physics Research, Section A (Accelerators, Spectrometers, Detectors and Associated Equipment), 11 Jan. 1998, Elsevier, Netherlands, vol. 402, no. 2-3, ISSN 0168-9002, pages 454 - 460, XP004107387 [Y] 18,19 * see the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-9002(97)00889-9
 [Y]  - BLACK R D ET AL, "In vivo He-3 MR images of guinea pig lungs", RADIOLOGY, JUNE 1996, RADIOL. SOC. NORTH AMERICA, USA, vol. 199, no. 3, ISSN 0033-8419, pages 867 - 870, XP002111040 [Y] 30,31 * see the whole document *
 [A]  - WAGSHUL M E ET AL, "In vivo MR imaging and spectroscopy using hyperpolarized /sup 129/Xe", MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, AUG. 1996, WILLIAMS & WILKINS, USA, vol. 36, no. 2, ISSN 0740-3194, pages 183 - 191, XP002070307 [A] 1,22,32 * see the whole document *
by applicantUS5545396
 US5642625
 US5809801
 US5833947
 US5522390
 US5509412
 US5494655
    - MUGLER III ET AL., "MR Imaging and Spectroscopy Using Hyperpolarized Xe gas : Preliminary Human results.", 37 MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, (1997), vol. 37, pages 809 - 815
    - A. BIFONE ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1996), vol. 93, page 12932
    - J.P. MUGLER, "Gradient-Echo MR Imaging, RSNA Categorical Course in Physics", THE BASIC PHYSICS OF MR IMAGING, (1997), pages 71 - 88
    - C.J. HARDY AND H.E. CLINE, "Broadband nuclear magnetic resonance pulses with two-dimenional spatial selectivity.", J. APPL. PHYS., (19890815), vol. 66, no. 4
    - C.J. HARDY ET AL., "Correcting for nonuniform k-space sampling in two dimensional NMR Selective Excitation, 87.", JNL. MAGNETIC RESONANCE, (1990), vol. 87, pages 639 - 645
 US19970989604