Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1066537 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1066537



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 2586
28.09.2018 Closing of application Search / examination 2
27.06.2018 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
04.05.2018 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
08.05.2017 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
04.05.2016 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
07.05.2015 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
07.05.2014 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
31.03.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
06.05.2013 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
04.05.2012 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
08.02.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
08.02.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
08.02.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
01.02.2011 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 21
16.11.2010 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 10
04.11.2010 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 21
04.10.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
04.10.2010 Claims Appeal 5
04.10.2010 Claims Appeal 4
04.10.2010 Claims Appeal 4
04.10.2010 Claims Appeal 4
04.10.2010 Claims Appeal 4
04.10.2010 Claims Appeal 4
04.10.2010 Claims Appeal 4
04.10.2010 Claims Appeal 5
04.10.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
04.10.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
17.08.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
17.08.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
17.08.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
08.07.2010 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 10
05.07.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
01.07.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
23.06.2010 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
20.05.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
20.05.2010 Claims Appeal 5
20.05.2010 Claims Appeal 5
20.05.2010 Claims Appeal 5
20.05.2010 Claims Appeal 4
20.05.2010 Claims Appeal 4
20.05.2010 Claims Appeal 4
20.05.2010 Claims Appeal 4
20.05.2010 Claims Appeal 4
20.05.2010 Claims Appeal 4
20.05.2010 Claims Appeal 5
20.05.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
20.05.2010 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 9
20.05.2010 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
10.03.2010 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 1
24.02.2010 Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 1
22.02.2010 Decision of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 2
15.02.2010 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 2
15.02.2010 Decision of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 76
17.11.2009 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 2
12.11.2009 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
11.11.2009 Communication of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 3
11.11.2009 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 3
11.11.2009 Request concerning the applicant/representative Appeal 1
09.11.2009 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 2
29.10.2009 Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 1
23.10.2009 Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 1
20.10.2009 Incomming letter in referral procedure Appeal 11
20.10.2009 Incomming letter in referral procedure Appeal 12
20.10.2009 Incomming letter in referral procedure Appeal 6
20.10.2009 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
16.09.2009 Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 5
16.09.2009 Communication of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 4
25.06.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
19.06.2009 Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 1
19.06.2009 Communication of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 1
16.06.2009 Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 1
17.11.2008 Incomming letter in referral procedure Appeal 9
30.10.2008 Incomming letter in referral procedure Appeal 12
29.09.2008 Incomming letter in referral procedure Appeal 3
02.07.2008 Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 1
20.05.2008 Incomming letter in referral procedure Appeal 3
16.05.2008 Incomming letter in referral procedure Appeal 5
01.04.2008 Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 1
11.03.2008 amicus curiae Appeal 16
20.02.2008 Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 1
20.02.2008 Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 1
19.02.2008 Incomming letter in referral procedure Appeal 5
19.02.2008 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
19.02.2008 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
13.12.2007 Composition of the board Appeal 1
30.11.2007 Incomming letter in referral procedure Appeal 27
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 21
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 24
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 21
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 35
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 16
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 16
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 50
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 27
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 80
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
30.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
30.11.2007 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 30
30.11.2007 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
30.11.2007 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
30.11.2007 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 20
30.11.2007 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 20
30.11.2007 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
30.11.2007 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
30.11.2007 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
30.11.2007 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 17
30.11.2007 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 24
30.11.2007 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
30.11.2007 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
30.11.2007 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 19
30.11.2007 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
30.11.2007 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
30.11.2007 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
30.11.2007 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
30.11.2007 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
30.11.2007 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 37
30.11.2007 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
30.11.2007 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 22
30.11.2007 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 31
30.11.2007 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
30.11.2007 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
30.11.2007 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
30.11.2007 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
30.11.2007 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 20
30.11.2007 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
30.11.2007 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
30.11.2007 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
30.11.2007 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 27
30.11.2007 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 23
30.11.2007 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 18
30.11.2007 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
30.11.2007 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 44
30.11.2007 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 44
30.11.2007 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 23
13.11.2007 Incomming letter in referral procedure Appeal 49
12.11.2007 Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 1
09.11.2007 amicus curiae Appeal 6
08.11.2007 Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 1
08.11.2007 Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 1
08.11.2007 Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 1
08.11.2007 Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 1
08.11.2007 Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 1
08.11.2007 Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 1
08.11.2007 Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 1
08.11.2007 Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 1
08.11.2007 Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 1
08.11.2007 Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 1
08.11.2007 Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 1
08.11.2007 Incomming letter in referral procedure Appeal 51
07.11.2007 amicus curiae Appeal 7
07.11.2007 amicus curiae Appeal 5
07.11.2007 amicus curiae Appeal 6
03.11.2007 amicus curiae Appeal 20
02.11.2007 amicus curiae Appeal 13
02.11.2007 amicus curiae Appeal 8
02.11.2007 amicus curiae Appeal 8
31.10.2007 amicus curiae Appeal 2
31.10.2007 amicus curiae Appeal 7
31.10.2007 amicus curiae Appeal 20
31.10.2007 amicus curiae Appeal 9
31.10.2007 amicus curiae Appeal 6
31.10.2007 amicus curiae Appeal 11
31.10.2007 amicus curiae Appeal 14
30.10.2007 amicus curiae Appeal 7
30.10.2007 amicus curiae Appeal 9
29.10.2007 amicus curiae Appeal 6
27.10.2007 amicus curiae Appeal 2
12.10.2007 Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 1
01.10.2007 Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 1
19.09.2007 Incomming letter in referral procedure Appeal 1
12.09.2007 amicus curiae Appeal 2
24.08.2007 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 3
24.08.2007 F3033.1 Forwarding decision correcting errors to the parties Appeal 3
04.07.2007 Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 1
27.06.2007 Incomming letter in referral procedure Appeal 5
29.05.2007 Communication of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 2
25.05.2007 Communication of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 2
25.05.2007 Communication of the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 2
25.05.2007 Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 1
17.04.2007 Composition of the board Appeal 1
11.04.2007 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 22
11.04.2007 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 22
02.11.2006 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 20
20.09.2006 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 39
06.09.2006 F3090 FAX Boards of Appeal (general) Appeal 3
04.09.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
01.09.2006 Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the EP procedure Search / examination 5
01.09.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
29.08.2006 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 13
01.08.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
29.07.2006 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
21.07.2006 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
02.06.2005 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
02.06.2005 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
02.05.2005 Composition of the board (only boards 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
06.10.2003 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) Appeal 1
19.09.2003 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
18.08.2003 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 45
15.08.2003 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 46
03.06.2003 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
10.05.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
10.05.2003 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
17.04.2003 Annex to a communication Search / examination 8
17.04.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
17.04.2003 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
17.04.2003 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
17.04.2003 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 17
17.04.2003 Means of redress Search / examination 1
17.04.2003 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
17.04.2003 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
17.04.2003 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
10.04.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 1
08.04.2003 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
26.03.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 2
13.03.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 4
28.02.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 20
10.01.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
02.01.2003 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
20.12.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
20.12.2002 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
19.12.2002 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
18.12.2002 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
16.12.2002 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
13.12.2002 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
04.12.2002 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 3
04.12.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
04.12.2002 Request concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 1
02.12.2002 Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
02.12.2002 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 4
02.12.2002 Request for further processing Search / examination 1
31.10.2002 Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them Search / examination 2
11.10.2002 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 3
11.10.2002 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 1
30.09.2002 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
04.07.2002 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
03.07.2002 Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.07.2002 Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
12.06.2002 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.06.2002 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
19.04.2002 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
15.04.2002 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.04.2002 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
11.12.2001 Annex to the communication Search / examination 7
11.12.2001 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.11.2001 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
29.11.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
16.10.2000 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
16.10.2000 Claims Search / examination 4
16.10.2000 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
13.10.2000 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
13.10.2000 Claims Search / examination 4
13.10.2000 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
13.10.2000 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
20.07.2000 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 12
20.07.2000 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 10
03.07.2000 Annex to International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 12
03.07.2000 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 10
03.07.2000 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
03.07.2000 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
20.04.2000 Claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 8
20.04.2000 Description PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
20.04.2000 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 9
18.04.2000 Claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 8
18.04.2000 Description PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
18.04.2000 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 9
17.04.2000 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
18.01.2000 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
18.01.2000 Written opinion - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
18.01.2000 Written opinion - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
11.11.1999 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
11.11.1999 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
04.10.1999 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
04.10.1999 Priority document Search / examination 42
01.10.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
30.09.1999 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
30.09.1999 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
23.09.1999 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
23.09.1999 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 47
13.08.1999 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 4
13.08.1999 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 4
17.05.1999 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
17.05.1999 Claims International Searching Authority 6
17.05.1999 Description International Searching Authority 35
17.05.1999 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 2
17.05.1999 Drawings International Searching Authority 3