Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1072116

EP1072116 - A WIRELESS INTERNET ACCESS METHOD AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.09.2013
Database last updated on 22.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.09.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.10.2013  [2013/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telcordia Technologies, Inc.
445 South Street, Room 1G-112R
Morristown, NJ 07960-6438 / US
[2001/05]
Inventor(s)01 / LIBERTI, Joseph, C.
11 Spruce Hollow Drive
Howell, NJ 07731 / US
02 / BARTON, Melbourne
5 Riviera Drive
Somerville, NJ 08876 / US
 [2001/05]
Representative(s)Beetz & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Steinsdorfstrasse 10
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/05]Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte
Steinsdorfstrasse 10
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99918601.816.04.1999
[2001/05]
WO1999US08349
Priority number, dateUS19980082073P17.04.1998         Original published format: US 82073 P
[2001/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9955030
Date:28.10.1999
Language:EN
[1999/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1072116
Date:31.01.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.1999
[2001/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US28.10.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.06.2005
ClassificationInternational:H04J3/16, H04B7/02, H04L27/26, H04B7/08, H04M7/00
[2005/22]
Former International [2001/05]H04J3/16, H04B7/02
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2001/05]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM DRAHTLOSEN INTERNETZUGANG[2001/05]
English:A WIRELESS INTERNET ACCESS METHOD AND SYSTEM[2001/05]
French:PROCEDE ET SYSTEME D'ACCES SANS FIL A INTERNET[2001/05]
Entry into regional phase06.11.2000National basic fee paid 
06.11.2000Search fee paid 
06.11.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
06.11.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.10.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
06.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/05]
16.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.09.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.01.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.08.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.12.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.04.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/42]
24.05.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2013/42]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.03.2006
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
28.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
26.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
27.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
02.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
02.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
29.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
26.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
25.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 13
25.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 14
29.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 15
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200204   M06   Fee paid on   28.06.2002
Documents cited:Search[X]US4581735  (FLAMM LOIS E [US], et al) [X] 2-5,7-12 * column 4, line 63 - column 5, line 40 * * figure 2 * * figure 3 *;
 [Y]US5528581  (BOT PAULUS GEORGE MARIA DE [NL]) [Y] 1,6 * column 1, line 15 - line 25 * * column 1, line 53 - line 56 * * column 2, line 19 - line 29 * * column 6, line 19 - line 23 *;
 [Y]US5617411  (MUELLER ANDREAS [DE]) [Y] 1,6 * column 4, line 15 - line 34 *;
 [A]US5063574  (MOOSE PAUL H [US]) [A] 1,6 * column 7, line 63 - line 68 *
 [A]  - CIMINI L J ET AL, "OFDM WITH DIVERSITY AND CODING FOR HIGH-BIT-RATE MOBILE DATA APPLICATIONS", INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON MOBILE MULTIMEDIA COMMUNICATIONS, (1997), pages 247 - 254, XP000856378 [A] 1,6 * page 249, paragraph 3; figure 1 *
International search[X]US5535239  (PADOVANI ROBERTO [US], et al);
 [A]US4763321  (CALVIGNAC JEAN [FR], et al);
 [A]US5228025  (LE FLOCH BERNARD [FR], et al)
by applicantUS4581735