EP1080138 - PLASMA SURFACE TREATMENT OF SILICONE HYDROGEL CONTACT LENSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAUSCH & LOMB INCORPORATED One Bausch & Lomb Place Rochester New York 14604-2701 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/10] | For all designated states BAUSCH & LOMB INCORPORATED One Bausch & Lomb Place Rochester, New York 14604-2701 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VALINT, Paul, L., Jr. 1 Farm Field Lane Pittsford, NY 14534 / US | 02 /
GROBE, George, L. 14 Old Lyme Road Pittsford, NY 14534 / US | 03 /
AMMON, Daniel, M., Jr. 179 Hurstbourne Road Rochester, NY 14609 / US | 04 /
MOOREHEAD, Michael, J. 1 Gateway Road Fairport, NY 14450 / US | [2001/10] | Representative(s) | Bowman, Paul Alan Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/10] | Bowman, Paul Alan LLOYD WISE, TREGEAR & CO., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 99918751.1 | 21.04.1999 | [2001/10] | WO1999US08749 | Priority number, date | US19980084332P | 05.05.1998 Original published format: US 84332 P | [2001/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9957177 | Date: | 11.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1080138 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1080138 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C08J7/06, G02B1/04 | [2001/10] | CPC: |
C08J7/123 (EP,KR,US);
C08J7/06 (KR);
B29D11/00192 (EP,US);
B82Y15/00 (EP,US);
C08J7/056 (KR);
C08J7/08 (KR);
G02B1/043 (EP,US);
G02B1/10 (KR);
G02B1/12 (KR);
G02C7/049 (KR);
C08J2343/04 (EP,US);
C08J2383/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT [2001/10] | Title | German: | OBERFLÄCHENBEHANDLUNG VON SILIKONHYDROGEL-KONTAKTLINSEN MITTELS EINES PLASMAS | [2001/10] | English: | PLASMA SURFACE TREATMENT OF SILICONE HYDROGEL CONTACT LENSES | [2001/10] | French: | TRAITEMENT AU PLASMA D'UNE SURFACE DE LENTILLE DE CONTACT EN HYDROGEL CONTENANT DU SILICONE | [2001/10] | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/10] | 12.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 21.04.2003 | IE | 21.04.2003 | ES | 22.04.2003 | [2005/02] |
Former [2004/29] | GB | 21.04.2003 | |
IE | 21.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | GB | 21.04.2003 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH08227001 ; | [A]GB1362939 (AGFA GEVAERT AG) [A] 1-24 * claims 1-29 *; | [A]US3959105 (FENEBERG PAUL, et al) [A] 1-24 * claims 1-17 *; | [A]AU508477B (HOYA LENS CORP) [A] 1-24 * claims 1-6 * * page 5, line 14 - page 6, line 27 * * page 10, line 1 - line 27 *; | [A]US4217038 (LETTER EUGENE C [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * claims 1,4,623 * * column 1, line 7 - line 21 * * column 2, line 11 - line 15 * * column 3, line 30 - column 4, line 28 * * column 10, line 61 - column 11, line 4 * * column 11, line 26 - column 12, line 40 * * column 13, line 17 - line 41 *; | [A]US4980208 (SUGIYAMA AKIHISA [JP], et al) [A] 1-24* claim 1.3.5 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970131), vol. 097, no. 001, & JP08227001 A 19960903 (MENICON CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * |