Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1082469

EP1082469 - MAGNESIUM MECHANICAL ALLOYS FOR THERMAL HYDROGEN STORAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.12.2006
Database last updated on 23.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.12.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.01.2007  [2007/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ENERGY CONVERSION DEVICES, INC.
1675 West Maple Road Troy
Michigan 48084 / US
[2006/06]
Former [2001/11]For all designated states
ENERGY CONVERSION DEVICES, INC.
1675 West Maple Road
Troy Michigan 48084 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SAPRU, Krishna
1924 Smallbrook Court
Troy, MI 48098 / US
02 / MING, Lu
3153 Davenport
Rochester Hills, MI 48309 / US
03 / STETSON, Ned, T.
2658 Lantern Lane
Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US
 [2001/18]
Former [2001/11]01 / SAPRU, Krishna
1924 Smallbrook Court
Troy, MI 48098 / US
02 / MING, Lu
2341 Ravine Drive
Rochester Hills, MI 48309 / US
03 / STETSON, Ned, T.
2658 Lantern Lane
Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US
Representative(s)Kügele, Bernhard , et al
Novagraaf International SA
Chemin de l'Echo 3
1213 Onex / CH
[N/P]
Former [2001/11]Kügele, Bernhard , et al
NOVAPAT INTERNATIONAL SA, 9, Rue du Valais
1202 Genève / CH
Application number, filing date99918756.021.04.1999
[2001/11]
WO1999US08762
Priority number, dateUS1998006624724.04.1998         Original published format: US 66247
[2001/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9955926
Date:04.11.1999
Language:EN
[1999/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1082469
Date:14.03.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.1999
[2001/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1082469
Date:08.02.2006
Language:EN
[2006/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US04.11.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.12.2004
ClassificationInternational:C22C23/00, B22F9/00, H01M4/46, C01B3/00
[2005/35]
Former International [2005/05]C22C24/00, B22F9/00, H01M4/38, C01B3/00
Former International [2001/11]C22C24/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/11]
TitleGerman:MECHANISCHE MAGNESIUMLEGIERUNG FÜR DIE THERMISCHE WASSERSTOFFSPEICHERUNG[2001/11]
English:MAGNESIUM MECHANICAL ALLOYS FOR THERMAL HYDROGEN STORAGE[2001/11]
French:ALLIAGES DE MAGNESIUM OBTENUS PAR PROCEDE MECANIQUE ET DESTINES A UN STOCKAGE THERMIQUE D'HYDROGENE[2001/11]
Entry into regional phase29.09.2000National basic fee paid 
29.09.2000Search fee paid 
29.09.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
29.09.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.10.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
29.09.2000Examination requested  [2001/11]
02.05.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.06.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.08.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.12.2005Fee for grant paid
02.12.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.11.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
08.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
07.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
06.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
04.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO9619594  (ENERGY CONVERSION DEVICES INC [US]) [Y] 1-13 * claims 1-7 *;
 US5916381  [ ] (SAPRU KRISHNA [US], et al);
 [Y]WO9636084  (OVONIC BATTERY CO [US]) [Y] 1-13 * claim 1 *;
 [A]WO9623906  (HYDRO QUEBEC [CA], et al) [A] 1 * claims 1,9 *
International search[X]US4431561  (OVSHINSKY STANFORD R [US], et al);
 [AE]US5916381  (SAPRU KRISHNA [US], et al)