Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1074008

EP1074008 - COMBINED ARTICLE SURVEILLANCE AND PRODUCT IDENTIFICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.12.2004
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 20.08.2008  [2008/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sensormatic Electronics Corporation
6600 Congress Avenue
Boca Raton, Florida 33487 / US
[2004/02]
Former [2001/06]For all designated states
Sensormatic Electronics Corporation
951 Yamato Road
Boca Raton, Florida 33431-0700 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WISCHEROP, Jerome
2, rue de Paradis
F-75040 Paris / FR
02 / FERGUSON, David, B.
3376 N.W. 27th Avenue
Boca Raton, FL 33434 / US
03 / ALICOT, Jorge, F.
15849 Ashy Field Road
Davie, FL 33331 / US
04 / SHAFER, G., Mark
6848 Palmetto Circle South
Boca Raton, FL 33431 / US
 [2001/06]
Representative(s)Hafner, Dieter , et al
Patentanwaltskanzlei
Dr. D. Hafner
Schleiermacherstrasse 25
90491 Nürnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/34]Hafner, Dieter , et al
Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr. D. Hafner Schleiermacherstrasse 25
90491 Nürnberg / DE
Former [2004/02]Hafner, Dieter, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Hafner & Stippl, Patentanwälte, Schleiermacherstrasse 25
90491 Nürnberg / DE
Former [2001/06]Hafner, Dieter, Dr. Dipl.-Phys.
Ostendstrasse 132
90482 Nürnberg / DE
Application number, filing date99918821.223.04.1999
[2001/06]
WO1999US08963
Priority number, dateUS1998006550724.04.1998         Original published format: US 65507
[2001/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9956260
Date:04.11.1999
Language:EN
[1999/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1074008
Date:07.02.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.1999
[2001/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1074008
Date:11.02.2004
Language:EN
[2004/07]
Search report(s)International search reportUS04.11.1999
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP01.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:G08B13/14, E05B65/00, E05B73/00
[2001/37]
Former International [2001/06]G08B13/14, E05B65/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   SE [2001/06]
TitleGerman:KOMBINIERTES WARENÜBERWACHUNGS- UND PRODUKTIDENTIFIZIERUNGSSYSTEM[2001/06]
English:COMBINED ARTICLE SURVEILLANCE AND PRODUCT IDENTIFICATION SYSTEM[2001/06]
French:SYSTEME COMBINE DE SURVEILLANCE D'ARTICLES ET D'IDENTIFICATION DE PRODUITS[2001/06]
Entry into regional phase20.10.2000National basic fee paid 
20.10.2000Search fee paid 
20.10.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
20.10.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.11.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
20.10.2000Examination requested  [2001/06]
07.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.06.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.07.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.11.2003Fee for grant paid
26.11.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.11.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
22.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0594324  (SECURITY TAG SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1,4,11,15,16 * column 15, line 6 - column 15, line 50; figure - *;
 [DA]US5005125  (FARRAR JAMES G [US], et al) [DA] 1,4,11,15,16 * column 3, line 17 - column 10, line 14; figure - *;
 [A]US3973418  (CLOSE LEO R) [A] 1,4,11,15,16 * figure - *
International search[X]US5151684
 [Y]US5426419
 [Y]US4510489