blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1076550

EP1076550 - DUAL COMPONENT DENTIFRICE COMPOSITION FOR FLUORIDATING TEETH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.07.2003
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip10.09.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 27.10.2004  [2004/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Colgate-Palmolive Company
300 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10022 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/08]For all designated states
Colgate-Palmolive Company
300 Park Avenue
New York, N.Y. 10022 / US
Inventor(s)01 / JOZIAK, Marilou, T.
51 Burton Avenue
South River, NJ 08882 / US
02 / TAVSS, Edward, A.
17 Kathy Street
Kendall Park, NJ 08824 / US
03 / FISHER, Steven, W.
321 Decatur Avenue
Middlesex, NJ 08846 / US
04 / GAMBOGI, Robert, J.
28 Matrick Court
Belle Mead, NJ 08502 / US
 [2001/18]
Former [2001/08]01 / JOZIAK, Marilou, T.
51 Burton Avenue
South River, NJ 08882 / US
02 / TAVSS, Edward, A.
17 Kathy Street
Kendall Park, NJ 08824 / US
03 / FISHER, Steven, W.
321 Decatur Avenue
Middlesex, NJ 08846 / US
04 / GAMBOGI, Robert, J.
5 Manor Drive
Belle Mead, NJ 08502 / US
Representative(s)Uexküll & Stolberg
Partnerschaft von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/08]UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG
Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date99918852.727.04.1999
[2001/08]
WO1999US09108
Priority number, dateUS1998006781928.04.1998         Original published format: US 67819
[2001/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9955297
Date:04.11.1999
Language:EN
[1999/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1076550
Date:21.02.2001
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2001/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1076550
Date:28.08.2002
Language:EN
[2002/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.11.1999
ClassificationIPC:A61K7/16, A61K7/18
[2001/08]
CPC:
A61Q11/00 (EP); A61K8/21 (EP); A61K8/24 (EP);
A61K2800/88 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/08]
Extension statesRO02.11.2000
TitleGerman:ZWEIKOMPONENTEN ZAHNPASTAZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR ZAHNFLUORIDIERUNG[2001/08]
English:DUAL COMPONENT DENTIFRICE COMPOSITION FOR FLUORIDATING TEETH[2001/08]
French:COMPOSITION DENTIFRICE A DEUX COMPOSANTES POUR FLUORATION DES DENTS[2001/08]
Entry into regional phase02.11.2000National basic fee paid 
02.11.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
02.11.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.11.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/08]
30.03.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.05.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
05.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.05.2002Fee for grant paid
10.05.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.05.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY27.04.2003
[2004/44]
Cited inInternational search[A]FR8273M  (THE KENDALL CO) [A] 1-12 * claim - *;
 [A]US5071637  (PELLICO MICHAEL A [US]) [A] 1-5,7,11,12 * example -; claim - *;
 [A]WO9746216  (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]) [A] 1* abstract *;
 [PA]WO9822079  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [PA] 1-12 * example -; claims 1-5,8 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.