blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1077835

EP1077835 - ACOUSTIC INSULATING VEHICLE COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.08.2003
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.09.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FI
published on 22.10.2003  [2003/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
RIETER AUTOMOTIVE (INTERNATIONAL) AG
Seestrasse 45
8702 Zollikon / CH
[2001/09]
Inventor(s)01 / ALTS, Thorsten
Pestalozzistrasse 32
D-64401 Gross-Bieberau / DE
02 / MARSCH, Ralf, Peter
Hauptstrasse 81
D-64380 Rossdorf / DE
03 / ERDKAMP, Marzell
Märzweg 16
D-64397 Modautal / DE
04 / BONNA, Edmund
Fürst Johann-Strasse 5
FL-9495 Triesen / LI
 [2001/09]
Representative(s)(deleted)
[2003/02]
Former [2002/27]Graf, Seifert & Partner
Intellectual Property Industrieplatz 3 Postfach 1179
8201 Schaffhausen / CH
Former [2002/16]Graf, Werner, et al
Graf Seifert & Partner, Postfach 1179
8201 Schaffhausen / CH
Former [2001/09]Ritscher, Thomas, Dr.Rer.Nat.Dipl.-Chem.
RITSCHER & SEIFERT, Patentanwälte, Forchstrasse 452, Postfach
8029 Zürich / CH
Application number, filing date99919013.512.05.1999
[2001/09]
WO1999CH00202
Priority number, dateCH1998000105012.05.1998         Original published format: CH 105098
[2001/09]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9958371
Date:18.11.1999
Language:DE
[1999/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1077835
Date:28.02.2001
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2001/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1077835
Date:02.10.2002
Language:DE
[2002/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.11.1999
ClassificationIPC:B60R13/08
[2001/09]
CPC:
B60R13/08 (EP,US); B32B5/02 (EP,US); B60R13/0815 (EP,US);
B60R13/083 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/09]
TitleGerman:AKUSTISCH WIRKSAMES FAHRZEUGBAUTEIL[2001/09]
English:ACOUSTIC INSULATING VEHICLE COMPONENT[2001/09]
French:ELEMENT D'ISOLATION ACOUSTIQUE POUR VEHICULE[2001/09]
Entry into regional phase06.10.2000National basic fee paid 
06.10.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
06.10.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.11.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
06.10.2000Examination requested  [2001/09]
30.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.07.2002Fee for grant paid
24.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.07.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI02.10.2002
NL02.10.2002
PT02.01.2003
SE02.01.2003
[2003/43]
Former [2003/30]NL02.10.2002
PT02.01.2003
SE02.01.2003
Former [2003/29]PT02.01.2003
SE02.01.2003
Former [2003/27]SE02.01.2003
Cited inInternational search[A]US4099590  (MARTIN SR ROBERT P) [A] 1 * column 2, line 31 - column 3, line 52; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]DE3800740  (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 1,9 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB2216081  (KASAI KOGYO KK [JP]) [A] 9,10 * page 4 - page 6, paragraph 1; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]EP0636517  (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1,9 * column 8, lines 21-35 * * column 10, lines 33-55; figure 1 *;
 [X]US5464952  (SHAH HITEN T [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 36; figures 2,3 *;
 [X]EP0680866  (CONTINENTAL AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-8,13,15-19 * column 4, line 44 - column 5, line 13 * * column 5, paragraph L - column 6, line 46 * * column 7, lines 34-53; figures 2,4; claim 7 *;
 [X]US5483028  (HOLWERDA MATTHEW J [US]) [X] 1 * column 2, lines 1-13,47-60; figure 1 *;
 [A]US5681072  (STRICKER KLAUS [DE]) [A] 2 * abstract *;
 [DA]WO9818657  (RIETER AUTOMOTIVE INT AG [CH], et al) [DA] 11* abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.