Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1084070

EP1084070 - CONVEYOR CHAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.07.2003
Database last updated on 13.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.04.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK
published on 30.05.2007  [2007/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Interroll Holding AG
Zona Industriale P.O. Box 61
CH-6592 San Antonino / CH
[2001/12]
Inventor(s)01 / SPECHT, Dieter
Via Livurcio, 78
CH-6618 Arcegno / CH
 [2001/12]
Representative(s)Rutetzki, Andreas
Müller-Boré & Partner
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Grafinger Strasse 2
81671 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/12]Rutetzki, Andreas, Dipl.-Ing.
Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2
81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date99919206.507.04.1999
[2001/12]
WO1999EP02357
Priority number, dateDE199811712517.04.1998         Original published format: DE 19817125
[2001/12]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9954239
Date:28.10.1999
Language:DE
[1999/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1084070
Date:21.03.2001
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.1999
[2001/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1084070
Date:11.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:B65G17/38
[2001/12]
Designated contracting statesDE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2001/12]
TitleGerman:TRANSPORTKETTE[2001/12]
English:CONVEYOR CHAIN[2001/12]
French:CHAINE TRANSPORTEUSE[2001/12]
Entry into regional phase21.09.2000National basic fee paid 
21.09.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
21.09.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.11.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
19.09.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.09.2000Examination requested  [2001/12]
29.11.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.06.2002Fee for grant paid
06.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL11.09.2002
DK11.12.2002
SE11.12.2002
[2007/22]
Former [2003/22]NL11.09.2002
SE11.12.2002
Former [2003/14]SE11.12.2002
Cited inInternational search[X]US4153152  (LAPEYRE JAMES M) [X] 1,3,4,7-10 * column 3, line 4 - column 4, line 39; figures 1-8 *;
 [XY]GB897549  (SUPREME CONVEYOR BELT COMPANY) [X] 1,2,4,5 * page 2, line 6 - line 70; figures 1-4 * [Y] 6;
 [X]FR1368646  (ATLAS CHAIN & MFG CO) [X] 1,3,4 * page 2, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3; figures 3-9 * * page 3, paragraph 1; figures 10,11 *;
 [Y]EP0462336  (SIMPLIMATIC ENG CO [US]) [Y] 6 * column 6, line 33 - line 51; figures 1,2 *;
 [Y]US5586644  (COEN DANIELE [IT], et al) [Y] 6 * column 3, line 25 - line 39; figure 5 *