Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0990293

EP0990293 - METHOD FOR DETECTING PHASE FAILURE IN AN ASYNCHRONOUS MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.05.2002
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.05.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.06.2002  [2002/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lenze GmbH & Co. KG
Hans-Lenze-Strasse 1
31855 Aerzen / DE
[2001/37]
Former [2000/14]For all designated states
Lenze GmbH & Co. KG Aerzen
Hans-Lenze-Strasse 1
D-31855 Aerzen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / KRIETEMEIER, Jürgen
Schwalbenweg 1
D-31855 Aerzen / DE
02 / HARTMANN, Elmar
Weberstrasse 27
D-31787 Hameln / DE
03 / SCHNURBUSCH, Wolfgang
Kiefernweg 4
D-31863 Coppenbrügge / DE
[2000/14]
Representative(s)Elbertzhagen, Otto , et al
Patentanwälte Thielking & Elbertzhagen Gadderbaumer Strasse 14
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]Elbertzhagen, Otto, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Thielking & Elbertzhagen Gadderbaumer Strasse 14
33602 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date99919229.714.04.1999
[2000/14]
WO1999EP02486
Priority number, dateDE199811722417.04.1998         Original published format: DE 19817224
[2000/14]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9954979
Date:28.10.1999
Language:DE
[1999/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0990293
Date:05.04.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.1999
[2000/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0990293
Date:04.07.2001
Language:DE
[2001/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:H02H7/08
[2000/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   DK,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2000/14]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR PHASENAUSFALLERKENNUNG BEI EINER ASYNCHRONMASCHINE[2000/14]
English:METHOD FOR DETECTING PHASE FAILURE IN AN ASYNCHRONOUS MACHINE[2000/14]
French:PROCEDE POUR LA DETECTION DE DEFAILLANCE DE PHASE DANS UN MOTEUR ASYNCHRONE[2000/14]
Entry into regional phase28.09.1999National basic fee paid 
28.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
28.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/14]
09.01.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
27.01.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
04.04.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.04.2001Fee for grant paid
30.04.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.04.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]DE4232476  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 20 - line 63 *