EP1073695 - PRODUCTION PROCESS OF COPPER PHTHALOCYANINE IN THE BETA MODIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2005 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 15.06.2005 [2005/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ciba Specialty Chemicals Holding Inc. Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | [2001/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATHERS, Richard Ernest 44 Hillside, Houston Renfrewshire PA6 7NT / GB | 02 /
KEIRS, David 11 Stanley Drive Paisley, Renfrewshire PA2 6HE / GB | 03 /
DYKES, Kenneth Grant 28 Newford Grove Clarkston, Glasgow G76 8QZ / GB | 04 /
HEALY, Thomas 37 Weevers Road Paisley PA2 9DP / GB | [2001/06] | Application number, filing date | 99919248.7 | 19.04.1999 | [2001/06] | WO1999EP02619 | Priority number, date | GB19980008169 | 20.04.1998 Original published format: GB 9808169 | [2001/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9954410 | Date: | 28.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1073695 | Date: | 07.02.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1073695 | Date: | 10.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C09B67/50, C09B67/04, C09D11/02, // (C09B67/12, 67:16, 67:18) | [2001/06] | CPC: |
C09D11/037 (EP,KR,US);
C09B67/0016 (EP,KR,US);
C09B67/001 (EP,KR,US);
C09B67/0023 (EP,KR,US);
C09B67/0026 (EP,KR,US);
C09D7/41 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2001/06] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN VON KUPFERPHTHALOCYANIN IN DER BETA MODIFIKATION | [2001/06] | English: | PRODUCTION PROCESS OF COPPER PHTHALOCYANINE IN THE BETA MODIFICATION | [2001/06] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE BLEU DE PHTALOCYANINE DANS LA PHASE DE MODIFICATION BETA | [2001/06] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.09.2000 | Examination requested [2001/06] | 04.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.09.2003 | SE | 10.12.2003 | PT | 18.12.2003 | IE | 19.04.2004 | [2005/24] |
Former [2004/31] | AT | 10.09.2003 | |
SE | 10.12.2003 | ||
PT | 18.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/16] | AT | 10.09.2003 | |
SE | 10.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | AT | 10.09.2003 | Cited in | International search | [Y]FR1497687 (ICI LTD) [Y] 1-22 * page 3, column R, paragraph L - page 4, column L, paragraph 1; examples 5,16 *; | [A]FR1512124 (GEIGY AG J R) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [D]GB1512124 (THERMO ELECTRON CORP); | [A]EP0392334 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-22 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0452258 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [Y] 1-22 * abstract *; | [D]US5449774 (LAMBIE IAN A [GB], et al); | [A]EP0774494 (CIBA GEIGY [CH]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]EP0780446 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] 1-8,10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0803545 (TOYO INK MFG CO [JP]) [A] 1-22 * column 4, line 26 - line 33; example -; claims 8,9 *; | [A]EP0808878 (TOYO INK MFG CO [JP]) [A] 1-22 * abstract *; | [A]EP0819740 (TOYO INK MFG CO [JP]) [A] 1-22 * abstract * |