Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1090094

EP1090094 - LIQUEFIED PETROLEUM GAS FUEL FOR COMPRESSION IGNITION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.02.2004
Database last updated on 13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.02.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 14.04.2004  [2004/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Iwatani International Corporation
4-8, Hommachi 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 541-0053 / JP
For all designated states
Tamura, Masamitsu
3-6-23, Kashiwanoba Kashiwa-shi
Chiba 277-0882 / JP
For all designated states
Goto, Shinichi
3-4-12, Matsumaedai, Moriya-machi Kitasouma-gun
Ibaraki 302-0102 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/15]For all designated states
Iwatani International Corporation
4-8, Hommachi 3-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0053 / JP
For all designated states
Tamura, Masamitsu
3-6-23, Kashiwanoba
Kashiwa-shi, Chiba 277-0882 / JP
For all designated states
Goto, Shinichi
3-4-12, Matsumaedai, Moriya-machi
Kitasouma-gun, Ibaraki 302-0102 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / TAMURA, Masamitsu
3-6-23, Kashiwanoha
Kashiwa-shi, Chiba 277-0882 / JP
02 / GOTO, Shinichi
3-4-12, Matsumaedai, Moriya-machi
Kitasouma-gun, Ibaraki 302-0102 / JP
03 / MAMEDA, Takeshi, Iwatani Int. Corp.
3-21-8, Nishi Shinbashi, Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-0003 / JP
04 / WAKAO, Yoshitaka, Iwatani Int. Corp.
3-21-8, Nishi Shinbashi, Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-0003 / JP
 [2001/15]
Representative(s)Geyer, Ulrich F.
WAGNER & GEYER
Patentanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/15]Geyer, Ulrich F., Dr. Dipl.-Phys.
WAGNER & GEYER, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99919637.118.05.1999
[2001/15]
WO1999JP02575
Priority number, dateJP1998014380626.05.1998         Original published format: JP 14380698
[2001/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9961564
Date:02.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1090094
Date:11.04.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.1999
[2001/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:C10L3/12
[2001/15]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2001/15]
TitleGerman:LPG-BRENNSTOFF FÜR KOMPRESSIONSZÜNDUNGSMASCHINE[2001/15]
English:LIQUEFIED PETROLEUM GAS FUEL FOR COMPRESSION IGNITION ENGINE[2001/15]
French:GAZ DE PETROLE LIQUEFIE POUR MOTEUR A ALLUMAGE PAR COMPRESSION[2001/15]
Entry into regional phase24.11.2000National basic fee paid 
24.11.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
24.11.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.08.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
24.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/15]
25.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
07.10.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/16]
12.11.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
28.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0819753  (NIPPON OIL CO LTD [JP]);
 [PA]US5782936  (RILEY RICHARD A [US])