Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1076954

EP1076954 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ELECTRONIC TRANSMISSION, STORAGE AND RETRIEVAL OF AUTHENTICATED DOCUMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.06.2007
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.01.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 10.02.2010  [2010/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
eOriginal, Inc.
351 West Camden Street Suite 800
Baltimore, MD 21201 / US
[2006/30]
Former [2006/22]For all designated states
eOriginal Inc
351 West Camden Street Suite 800
Baltimore, MD 21201 / US
Former [2001/08]For all designated states
Eoriginal Inc.
Suite 800, 323 West Camden Street
Baltimore, MD 21201 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BISBEE, Stephen, F.
7309 Brightside Road
Baltimore, MD 21212 / US
02 / MOSKOWITZ, Jack, J.
15234 Callaway Court
Glenwood, MD 21738 / US
03 / TROTTER, Douglas, H.
4332 N. Charles Street
Baltimore, MD 21218 / US
04 / WHITE, Michael, W.
1913 Midland Road
Baltimore, MD 21222 / US
 [2006/21]
Former [2001/08]01 / BISBEE, Stephen, F.
2800 Butler Road
Glyndon, MD 21071 / US
02 / MOSKOWITZ, Jack, J.
4632 Autumn Woods Way
Ellicott City, MD 21043 / US
03 / TROTTER, Douglas, H.
4332 N. Charles Street
Baltimore, MD 21218 / US
04 / WHITE, Michael, W.
1913 Midland Road
Baltimore, MD 21222 / US
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/08]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date99919760.104.05.1999
[2001/08]
WO1999US06563
Priority number, dateUS1998007207904.05.1998         Original published format: US 72079
[2001/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9957847
Date:11.11.1999
Language:EN
[1999/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1076954
Date:21.02.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.1999
[2001/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1076954
Date:26.07.2006
Language:EN
[2006/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04L9/32
[2001/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/08]
TitleGerman:GERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUR ELEKTRONISCHEN VERSENDUNG, SPEICHERUNG UND WIEDERGEWINNUNG VON AUTHENTIFIZIERTEN DOKUMENTEN[2001/08]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ELECTRONIC TRANSMISSION, STORAGE AND RETRIEVAL OF AUTHENTICATED DOCUMENTS[2001/08]
French:SYSTEME ET PROCEDE POUR L'EMISSION, LE STOCKAGE ET L'EXTRACTION ELECTRONIQUES DE DOCUMENTS AUTHENTIFIES[2001/08]
Entry into regional phase04.12.2000National basic fee paid 
04.12.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
04.12.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.12.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/08]
29.01.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.02.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.06.2006Fee for grant paid
02.06.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.04.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
14.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
13.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
12.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
10.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200305   M06   Fee paid on   12.11.2003
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT26.07.2006
BE26.07.2006
CH26.07.2006
CY26.07.2006
FI26.07.2006
IT26.07.2006
LI26.07.2006
NL26.07.2006
DK26.10.2006
SE26.10.2006
GR27.10.2006
ES06.11.2006
PT26.12.2006
[2010/06]
Former [2008/21]AT26.07.2006
BE26.07.2006
CH26.07.2006
FI26.07.2006
IT26.07.2006
LI26.07.2006
NL26.07.2006
DK26.10.2006
SE26.10.2006
GR27.10.2006
ES06.11.2006
PT26.12.2006
Former [2008/17]AT26.07.2006
BE26.07.2006
CH26.07.2006
FI26.07.2006
IT26.07.2006
LI26.07.2006
NL26.07.2006
DK26.10.2006
SE26.10.2006
ES06.11.2006
PT26.12.2006
Former [2007/31]AT26.07.2006
BE26.07.2006
CH26.07.2006
FI26.07.2006
LI26.07.2006
NL26.07.2006
DK26.10.2006
SE26.10.2006
ES06.11.2006
PT26.12.2006
Former [2007/23]AT26.07.2006
CH26.07.2006
FI26.07.2006
LI26.07.2006
NL26.07.2006
DK26.10.2006
SE26.10.2006
ES06.11.2006
PT26.12.2006
Former [2007/22]CH26.07.2006
FI26.07.2006
LI26.07.2006
NL26.07.2006
DK26.10.2006
SE26.10.2006
ES06.11.2006
PT26.12.2006
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9712460  (DOCUMENT AUTHENTICATION SYSTEM [US]) [X] 1-11 * figures 1,6A,6B *;
 [DPX]US5748738  (BISBEE STEPHEN F [US], et al) [DPX] 1-11 * figures 1,6A,6B *;
 [DX]US5615268  (BISBEE STEPHEN F [US], et al) [DX] 1-11 * figures 1,6A,6B *;
 [X]  - DEKLEERMAEKER L, "The validity of electronic communication", INFORMATIE, APRIL 1996, KLUWER BEDRIJFSWETENSCHAPPEN, NETHERLANDS, vol. 38, spec. issue., ISSN 0019-9907, pages 36 - 41, XP002111654 [X] 1-11 * page 38 - page 41; figures 1,2 *