Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1110116

EP1110116 - MOTORIZED VEHICLE MIRROR ACTUATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.03.2004
Database last updated on 20.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.03.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.05.2004  [2004/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LDI, Inc.
4311 Patterson S.E.
Grand Rapids, MI 49512 / US
[2001/26]
Inventor(s)01 / LOHSS, Kurt, L.
795 East Lake Road
Pentwater, MI 49449 / US
 [2001/26]
Representative(s)West, Alan Harry , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/26]West, Alan Harry , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date99919833.613.04.1999
[2001/26]
WO1999US08152
Priority number, dateUS19980081548P13.04.1998         Original published format: US 81548 P
[2001/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0062111
Date:19.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1110116
Date:27.06.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.2000
[2001/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US19.10.2000
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:G02B7/182, G02B5/08, G02B27/00, B60R1/02
[2002/36]
Former International [2001/26]G02B7/182, G02B5/08, G02B27/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   SE [2001/26]
TitleGerman:MOTORISIERTES SPIEGELVERSTELLUNGSSYSTEM FÜR FAHRZEUGE[2001/26]
English:MOTORIZED VEHICLE MIRROR ACTUATOR[2001/26]
French:DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE MOTORISE D'UN RETROVISEUR POUR VEHICULE[2001/26]
Entry into regional phase13.01.2000National basic fee paid 
13.01.2000Search fee paid 
13.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
06.04.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.11.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
06.04.2001Examination requested  [2001/26]
01.11.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/20]
11.12.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/20]
19.12.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200305   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0446095  (PEUGEOT [FR], et al) [Y] 1-4,8,11 * the whole document *;
 [Y]DE3207200  (FRESE METALLWERK [DE]) [Y] 1-4,8,11 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0151673  (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]);
 [A]FR2601911  (PEUGEOT [FR], et al);
 [A]FR2423374  (GILARDINI SPA [IT]);
 [A]DE3423520  (WUNSCH ECKART [DE]);
 [A]DE2708328  (MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO)
International search[Y]US5798881  (MAZUREK NIEL [US], et al);
 [Y]US5701211  (PERRY WILLIAM [US], et al);
 [Y]US5636071  (MOCHIZUKI TOSHIHIRO [JP], et al)
by applicantUS5189561
 US5159497
 US5052792