Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0991361

EP0991361 - MEDICAL RETRIEVAL BASKET WITH A NON-POINTED DISTAL END [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/15]ATRAUMATIC MEDICAL RETRIEVAL DEVICE
[2012/02]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.06.2013
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.06.2013No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.07.2013  [2013/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Boston Scientific Limited
The Corporate Centre, Bush Hill, Bay Street St. Michael
Barbados, West Indies / BB
[2012/31]
Former [2001/25]For all designated states
Boston Scientific Limited
The Corporate Center, Bush Hill, Bay Street
St. Michael, Barbados, West Indies / BB
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
SciMed Life Systems, Inc.
One SciMed Place
Maple Grove, Minnesota 55311-1566 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BATES, James, S.
4725 N. Marybelle Way
Bloomington, IN 47404 / US
02 / QUE, Like
959 Eminence Way
Bloomington, IN 47401 / US
03 / RILEY, James, W.
5917 Foxwood Lane
Bloomington, IN 47401 / US
04 / TEAGUE, James, A.
R.R. 5
Box 306
Spencer, IN 47460 / US
 [2012/31]
Former [2000/15]01 / BATES, James, S.
4725 N. Marybelle Way
Bloomington, IN 47404 / US
02 / QUE, Like
959 Eminence Way
Bloomington, IN 47401 / US
03 / RILEY, James, W.
5917 Foxwood Lane
Bloomington, IN 47401 / US
04 / TEAGUE, James, A.
R.R. 5 Box 306
Spencer, IN 47460 / US
Representative(s)Intès, Didier Gérard André
Cabinet Beau de Loménie
158 rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2012/31]Intès, Didier Gérard André
Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
Former [2008/36]Intes, Didier Gérard André
Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
Former [2005/29]Trueman, Lucy Petra , et al
Barker Brettell, 138 Hagley Road, Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 9PW / GB
Former [2001/25]Attfield, Donald James , et al
Barker Brettell 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 9PW / GB
Former [2000/15]Attfield, Donald James
Barker Brettell 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 9PW / GB
Application number, filing date99919881.522.04.1999
[2000/15]
WO1999US08490
Priority number, dateUS19980082810P23.04.1998         Original published format: US 82810 P
US19980105448P23.10.1998         Original published format: US 105448 P
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9953850
Date:28.10.1999
Language:EN
[1999/43]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0991361
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.1999
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0991361
Date:01.08.2012
Language:EN
[2012/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/221
[2012/02]
Former International [2000/15]A61B17/22
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IE,   NL [2000/15]
TitleGerman:MEDIZINISCHER FANGKORB MIT EINEM NICHT SPITZEN DISTALEN ENDE[2012/02]
English:MEDICAL RETRIEVAL BASKET WITH A NON-POINTED DISTAL END[2012/02]
French:PANIER D'EXTRACTION MÉDICAL AVEC UNE PARTIE DISTALE NON POINTUE[2012/02]
Former [2000/15]ATRAUMATISCHE MEDIZINISCHE VORRICHTUNG ZUR BERGUNG VON ABGETRENNTEN ORGANTEILEN
Former [2000/15]ATRAUMATIC MEDICAL RETRIEVAL DEVICE
Former [2000/15]DISPOSITIF D'EXTRACTION MEDICALE ATRAUMATIQUE
Entry into regional phase19.01.2000National basic fee paid 
19.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
12.05.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/28]
08.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.08.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.01.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.12.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.04.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.01.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.05.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.07.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.11.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.02.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.06.2012Fee for grant paid
20.06.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.11.2002
Opposition(s)03.05.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
08.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
07.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
06.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
04.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
27.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
10.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
18.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
07.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
15.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
06.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 13
28.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 14
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL01.08.2012
[2013/15]
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0737450  (CORDIS EUROP [NL]) [X] 1,2,14 * abstract *;
 [X]EP0512729  (VANCE PRODUCTS INC [US]) [X] 1,2,5,14 * column 3, line 12 - column 4, line 49; figure 1 *;
 [X]US4807626  (MCGIRR DOUGLAS B [US]) [X] 1,2,5,14-18 * column 2, line 37 - column 3, line 20; figures 1,2 *;
 [X]US2556783  (WALLACE FREDERICK J) [X] 1,2,5,14 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5057114  (WITTICH GERHARD R [US], et al) [A] 1,6,7,14 * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 34; figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]US4590938  (SEGURA JOSEPH W [US], et al) [A] 1,6,7,14 * column 2, line 31 - line 65; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE8707516U  (SEUBERTH K) [A] 1,8,14 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [X]US5658296  (BATES JAMES S [US], et al) [X] 9-11,13 * column 6, line 36 - column 7, line 4; figure 7A *;
 [X]EP0123175  (KORTH KNUT DR [DE], et al) [X] 9,11,13 * page 10, line 11 - page 11, line 12; figures 3,4 *;
 [X]DE8501297U  (PAULDRACH G) [X] 9,12 * page 4, line 4 - line 27; figure 1 *