Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1098877

EP1098877 - DERIVATIZED POLYMERS OF ALPHA-OLEFIN-MALEIC ANHYDRIDE ALKYL HALF-ESTER OR FULL ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.11.2008
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2008Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 24.12.2008  [2008/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ISP INVESTMENTS INC.
300 Delaware Avenue Wilmington
Delaware 19801 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/20]For all designated states
ISP INVESTMENTS INC.
300 Delaware Avenue
Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ULMER, Herbert, W.
714 Washington Street
Hoboken, NJ 07030 / US
02 / GILLECE, Timothy
5516 Tudor Drive
Pompton Plains, NJ 07444 / US
03 / KATIRGIS, John, A.
123 Runnymede Road
West Caldwell, NJ 07006 / US
04 / FOLTIS, Linda, C.
16 Highfield Lane
Nutley, NJ 07110 / US
05 / BLAINE, April
11 Muscotah Road
Highland Lakes, NJ 07422 / US
 [2001/20]
Representative(s)Harrison, David Christopher , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/20]Harrison, David Christopher , et al
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date99920192.429.04.1999
[2001/20]
WO1999US09430
Priority number, dateUS1998010338624.06.1998         Original published format: US 103386
US1998010385624.06.1998         Original published format: US 103856
US1998010430924.06.1998         Original published format: US 104309
[2001/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9967216
Date:29.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1098877
Date:16.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.1999
[2001/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US29.12.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.11.2004
ClassificationInternational:C07D207/40, A61K7/06, A61K31/74, C08F8/32
[2005/02]
Former International [2001/20]C07D207/40, A61K7/06, A61K31/74
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/20]
TitleGerman:POLYMERDERIVATE DER ALPHA-OLEFIN-MALEINSÄURE-ANHYDRID-HALBESTER ODER DER VOLLEN SÄURE[2001/20]
English:DERIVATIZED POLYMERS OF ALPHA-OLEFIN-MALEIC ANHYDRIDE ALKYL HALF-ESTER OR FULL ACID[2001/20]
French:POLYMERES DERIVATISES D'ALKYL-SEMI-ESTER D'ANHYDRIDE ALPHA-OLEFINE-MALEIQUE OU DE L'ACIDE TOTAL[2001/20]
Entry into regional phase15.01.2001National basic fee paid 
15.01.2001Search fee paid 
15.01.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
15.01.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.11.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
15.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/20]
27.12.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.07.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.12.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.06.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/52]
29.07.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2008/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
13.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
01.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
30.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
24.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
28.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
22.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0654486  (TOSOH CORP [JP]) [X] 1-12 * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 7 * * column 4, line 15 - line 43; claims 1-10 *;
 [X]EP0154177  (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1-12 * page 14, line 4 - line 7 * * page 15, line 9 - line 15 * * page 16, line 1 - line 22; claims 1-9 *;
 [A]DE3319014  (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1 * claims 1-10 *;
 [A]DE2416117  (TEXACO DEVELOPMENT CORP) [A] 1 * claims 1-8 *;
 [A]DE3644656  (UBE INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1 * claims 1-19 *;
 [PX]US5886194  (ULMER HERBERT W [US], et al) [PX] 1-12 * the whole document *
International search[AP]US5886194  (ULMER HERBERT W [US], et al)