EP1082268 - ULTRAVIOLET TREATMENT FOR AQUEOUS LIQUIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UV Pure Technologies, Inc. 60 Venture Drive, Unit 19 Toronto Ontario M1B 3S4 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2005/09] | For all designated states UV Pure Technologies, Inc. 60 Venture Drive, Unit 19 Toronto, Ontario M1B 3S4 / CA | ||
Former [2001/11] | For all designated states Hallett, Ronald C. 526 McLeod Crescent Pickering, Ontario L1W 3M5 / CA | ||
For all designated states Hallett, Douglas J. R.R. No 2 Acton, Ontario L7J 2L8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hallett, Ronald C. 526 McLeod Crescent Pickering, Ontario L1W 3M5 / CA | 02 /
Hallett, Douglas J. R.R. No. 2 Acton, Ontario L7J 2L8 / CA | [2005/09] |
Former [2001/11] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/11] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99920496.9 | 13.05.1999 | [2001/11] | WO1999CA00435 | Priority number, date | US19980076902 | 13.05.1998 Original published format: US 76902 | CA19982255563 | 14.12.1998 Original published format: CA 2255563 | [2001/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9958453 | Date: | 18.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1082268 | Date: | 14.03.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1082268 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/32, A61L2/10, B01J19/12, A61M1/36 | [2001/11] | CPC: |
A61L2/0011 (EP);
C02F9/20 (EP,US);
A61L2/0047 (EP);
A61L2/10 (EP);
A61L2/18 (EP);
A61L2/28 (EP);
A61M1/3623 (EP,US);
A61M1/3681 (EP);
B01J19/123 (EP);
C02F1/325 (EP);
A61M2205/053 (EP);
B01J2219/00051 (EP);
B01J2219/00164 (EP);
B01J2219/0801 (EP);
B01J2219/0877 (EP);
C02F1/001 (EP);
C02F2201/009 (EP);
C02F2201/3221 (EP);
C02F2201/3227 (EP);
C02F2201/3228 (EP);
C02F2201/326 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61L2/0011, A61L2/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/11] | Extension states | AL | 13.12.2000 | LT | 13.12.2000 | LV | 13.12.2000 | MK | 13.12.2000 | RO | 13.12.2000 | SI | 13.12.2000 | Title | German: | ULTRAVIOLETTBEHANDLUNG FÜR WÄSSRIGE FLÜSSIGKEITEN | [2001/11] | English: | ULTRAVIOLET TREATMENT FOR AQUEOUS LIQUIDS | [2001/11] | French: | TRAITEMENT AUX ULTRAVIOLETS POUR LIQUIDES AQUEUX | [2001/11] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/11] | 09.03.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 17.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/51] | Request for further processing for: | 17.11.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 17.11.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.12.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2003 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   01.12.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.12.2004 | BE | 29.12.2004 | CH | 29.12.2004 | ES | 29.12.2004 | FI | 29.12.2004 | IT | 29.12.2004 | LI | 29.12.2004 | NL | 29.12.2004 | DK | 29.03.2005 | GR | 29.03.2005 | SE | 29.03.2005 | CY | 13.05.2005 | IE | 13.05.2005 | LU | 13.05.2005 | PT | 29.05.2005 | MC | 31.05.2005 | [2008/17] |
Former [2007/31] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
BE | 29.12.2004 | ||
CH | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 29.12.2004 | ||
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
LI | 29.12.2004 | ||
NL | 29.12.2004 | ||
DK | 29.03.2005 | ||
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
SE | 29.03.2005 | ||
CY | 13.05.2005 | ||
IE | 13.05.2005 | ||
LU | 13.05.2005 | ||
MC | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
BE | 29.12.2004 | ||
CH | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 29.12.2004 | ||
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
LI | 29.12.2004 | ||
NL | 29.12.2004 | ||
DK | 29.03.2005 | ||
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
SE | 29.03.2005 | ||
CY | 13.05.2005 | ||
IE | 13.05.2005 | ||
LU | 13.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/22] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
BE | 29.12.2004 | ||
CH | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 29.12.2004 | ||
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
LI | 29.12.2004 | ||
NL | 29.12.2004 | ||
DK | 29.03.2005 | ||
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
SE | 29.03.2005 | ||
CY | 13.05.2005 | ||
IE | 13.05.2005 | ||
LU | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
BE | 29.12.2004 | ||
CH | 29.12.2004 | ||
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
LI | 29.12.2004 | ||
NL | 29.12.2004 | ||
DK | 29.03.2005 | ||
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
IE | 13.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
BE | 29.12.2004 | ||
CH | 29.12.2004 | ||
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
LI | 29.12.2004 | ||
NL | 29.12.2004 | ||
DK | 29.03.2005 | ||
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
BE | 29.12.2004 | ||
CH | 29.12.2004 | ||
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
LI | 29.12.2004 | ||
DK | 29.03.2005 | ||
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
BE | 29.12.2004 | ||
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | FI | 29.12.2004 | |
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 29.12.2004 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US3628445 (WEBER GEORGES R) [X] 1,2,7,15-17,28-32,41-43,45,50,68-71 * figure - * * column 3, line 29 - line 38 * [A] 77-91; | [X]DE2753263 (HEMSCHEIDT MASCHF HERMANN) [X] 1-3,7,11-17,28-34,36-39,41-43,45,50,64-66,68-71,73,74,77-79,86,90 * page 3, line 22 - line 26 * * page 3, line 35 * * page 5, line 9 - line 16 * * figure - *; | [XA]FR2515655 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [X] 92 * page 1, line 27 - page 2, line 10 * * page 4, line 19 - page 5, line 4 * * page 6, line 6 - line 8 * * figure . * [A] 106; | [XA]FR2607129 (HANNART MARC [FR]) [X] 1-3,7,11-13,15-17,28,29,41-43,45-47,50,51,68-70,73,74,77,84-86 * page 7, line 15 - page 12, line 17 * * figures 21-28 * [A] 52,78,79; | [XA]DE3806378 (AUDI AG) [X] 1,2,4,7,13,15-17,28-30,32,33,41-43,45,50,64,65,73,75,76 * column 3, line 3 - line 52; figure - * [A] 77-91; | [A]US5227053 (BRYM STANLEY J [US]) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]DE4214994 (HAASE HELMUT [DE]) [A] * the whole document *; | [XA]US5366705 (REIDY JAMES J [US]) [X] 92,93 * column 4, line 35 - column 5, line 37; figure 3 * [A] 94; | [XA]DE4436134 (ZIEGERT OLAF [DE]) [X] 1-5,7,11-13,15-17,21-25,27,28,35-39,41-43,45,50,68-71,73-79,86,87 * column 2, line 43 - column 3, line 47 * * column 4, line 30 - column 5, line 19 * * column 6, line 37 - column 7, line 52 * * column 8, line 65 - column 9, line 42 * * figure - * [A] 112-227; | [DA]WO9805367 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [DA] * the whole document * |