Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1078406

EP1078406 - IMPROVED COMPOSITION OF A SELECTIVE OXIDATION CATALYST FOR USE IN FUEL CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  23.06.2006
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.06.2006Deletion: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DE NORA ELETTRODI S.P.A.
Via Dei Canzi, 1
20134 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2001/09]For all designated states
DE NORA ELETTRODI S.P.A.
Via Dei Canzi,1
20134 Milano / IT
Inventor(s)01 / GIALLOMBARDO, James, R.
15 Pacesetter Drive
Hampton, New Jersey 08827 / US
02 / DE CASTRO, Emory, S.
60 Little Nahant Road
Nahant, MA 01908-1028 / US
03 / ALLEN, Robert, J.
Adams Avenue
Saugus, MA 01906 / US
 [2001/14]
Former [2001/09]01 / GIALLOMBARDO, James, R.
Hull Street
Beverly, MA 01915 / US
02 / DE CASTRO, Emory, S.
Little Nahant Road
Nahant, MA 01908 / US
03 / ALLEN, Robert, J.
Adams Avenue
Saugus, MA 01906 / US
Representative(s)Kinzebach, Werner , et al
Reitstötter, Kinzebach & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 86 06 49
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/09]Kinzebach, Werner, Dr. , et al
Patentanwälte Reitstötter, Kinzebach und Partner Postfach 86 06 49
81633 München / DE
Application number, filing date99920673.314.04.1999
[2001/09]
WO1999EP02527
Priority number, dateUS19980081725P14.04.1998         Original published format: US 81725 P
US1999027166417.03.1999         Original published format: US 271664
[2001/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9953557
Date:21.10.1999
Language:EN
[1999/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1078406
Date:28.02.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.1999
[2001/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01M4/92, B01J23/652, H01M8/10
[2001/09]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2001/09]
TitleGerman:VERBESSERTE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG VON EINEM SELEKTIVEN OXIDATIONSKATALYSATOR FÜR BRENNSTOFFZELLEN[2001/09]
English:IMPROVED COMPOSITION OF A SELECTIVE OXIDATION CATALYST FOR USE IN FUEL CELLS[2001/09]
French:COMPOSITION AMELIOREE D'UN CATALYSEUR D'OXYDATION SELECTIVE UTILE DANS DES PILES A COMBUSTIBLE[2001/09]
Entry into regional phase11.10.2000National basic fee paid 
11.10.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
11.10.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.11.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.10.2000Examination requested  [2001/09]
23.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.10.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
04.07.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.01.2006Application refused, date of legal effect [2006/30]
13.01.2006Date of oral proceedings
06.02.2006Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2006/30]
06.02.2006Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
11.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[PA]JPH10270056  ;
 [DA]US4082699  (PETROW HENRY G, et al) [DA] 8-10 * column 4, line 5 - line 35 * * column 8, line 4 - line 19 * * example 8 *
 [PX]  - S.MUKERJEE, S.J. LEE, P. N. ROSS AND ALL, "Investigation of enhanced CO tolerance in proton exchange membrane fuel cells by carbon supported PtMo alloy catalyst", ELECTROCHEMICAL AND SOLID-STATE LETTERS, (199901), vol. 2, pages 12 - 15, XP002112463 [PX] 1-5,17,18 * page 12, column L, paragraph 3 * * page 12, column R, paragraph 2 * * page 13, column L, paragraph 2 * * page 13, column L, paragraph 4 * * page 14, column R, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1149/1.1390718
 [DA]  - B. N. GRGUR, G. ZHUANG, N. M. MARKOVIC, P. N. ROSS JR., "Electrooxidation of H2/CO mixtures on a Well-characterized Pt75Mo25 Alloy surface", THE JOURNAL OF PHYSICAL CHEMISTRY B, (1997), vol. 101, no. 20, pages 3910 - 3913, XP002112464 [DA] 1,17 * page 3910, column L, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * * page 3911, column R, paragraph 4 - page 3912, column L, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jp9704168
 [PA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990129), vol. 099, no. 001, [PA] 1,17 * abstract *
    [] - MITSUDA, NORIAKI ET AL, "Anode catalysts for solid polymer electrolyte fuel cells", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19981116), vol. 129, no. 20, Database accession no. 262814, XP002112465 [ ] * abstract *
 [PA]  - GOTZ M ET AL, "Binary and ternary anode catalyst formulations including the elements W, Sn and Mo for PEMFCs operated on methanol or reformate gas", ELECTROCHIMICA ACTA, (19980821), vol. 43, no. 24, ISSN 0013-4686, page 3637-3644, XP004132402 [PA] 1,2,4-7,17,18 * page 3638, column L, paragraph 3 * * page 3639, column L, paragraph 2 * * page 3639, column L, paragraph 4 - page 3640, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 3639 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0013-4686(98)00121-2