Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1073747

EP1073747 - BASB013 DNA AND PROTEINS FROM NEISSERIA MENINGITIDIS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  10.09.2004
Database last updated on 20.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip12.06.2009Change - representativepublished on 15.07.2009  [2009/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals s.a.
rue de l'Institut 89
1330 Rixensart / BE
[N/P]
Former [2003/03]For all designated states
GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals S.A.
Rue de l'Institut 89
1330 Rixensart / BE
Former [2001/06]For all designated states
SMITHKLINE BEECHAM BIOLOGICALS S.A.
89 rue de l'Institut
1330 Rixensart / BE
Inventor(s)01 / RUELLE, Jean-Louis
SmithKline Beecham Biologicals S.A.
89, rue de l'Institut B-1330 Rixensart / BE
 [2001/06]
Representative(s)Lubienski, Michael John , et al
GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents (CN925.1)
980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 8GS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/29]Lubienski, Michael John , et al
GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property CN925.1 980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
Former [2004/03]Lubienski, Michael John , et al
GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property Two New Horizons Court
GB-Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB
Former [2001/06]Mallalieu, Catherine Louise , et al
D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date99920767.320.04.1999
[2001/06]
WO1999EP02765
Priority number, dateGB1998000873423.04.1998         Original published format: GB 9808734
[2001/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9955872
Date:04.11.1999
Language:EN
[1999/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1073747
Date:07.02.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.1999
[2001/06]
Search report(s)International search reportEP04.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/31, C12N15/11, C12N15/70, C12N1/21, C07K16/12, G01N33/53, G01N33/50, A61K31/70, A61K39/095, A61K39/40, C07K14/22
[2001/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/06]
TitleGerman:BASB013 DNS UND PROTEINE VON NEISSERIA MENINGITIDIS[2001/06]
English:BASB013 DNA AND PROTEINS FROM NEISSERIA MENINGITIDIS[2001/06]
French:ADN BASB013 ET PROTEINES DERIVEES DE NEISSERIA MENINGITIDIS[2001/06]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase23.11.2000National basic fee paid 
23.11.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
23.11.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.10.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/06]
14.07.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.11.2003Fee for grant paid
05.11.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.08.2004Application withdrawn by applicant  [2004/44]
Divisional application(s)EP04076205.6  / EP1702986
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
02.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
03.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0301992  (NACIONAL DE BIOPREPARADOS CENT [CU]) [A] 1-28 * page 3, line 43 - line 62 * * page 8, line 36 - page 10, line 44 *;
 [A]WO9802547  (INST NAT SANTE RECH MED [FR], et al) [A] 1-28 * page 22, line 9 - line 26; examples 1,5,6; claims 1-32 *
 [XA]  - LOOSMORE ET AL., "The Haemophilus influenza HtrA protein is a protective antigen", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, (199803), vol. 66, no. 3, pages 899 - 906, XP002112241 [X] 6,21,24-26,28 * the whole document * [A] 1-5,7-20,22-24