EP1076807 - OPTICAL CLINOMETER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.01.2003 [2003/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZSP Geodätische Systeme GmbH Carl-Zeiss-Promenade 10 07745 Jena / DE | [2001/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MONZ, Ludwin-Heinz Käthe-Kollwitz-Weg 96 D-89081 Ulm / DE | 02 /
GLIMM, Andreas Am Horn 57 D-99425 Weimar / DE | [2001/08] | Representative(s) | Niestroy, Manfred, et al Patentanwälte Geyer, Fehners & Partner Sellierstrasse 1 07745 Jena / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/08] | Niestroy, Manfred, et al Patentanwälte Geyer, Fehners & Partner Sellierstrasse 1 07745 Jena / DE | Application number, filing date | 99920807.7 | 28.04.1999 | [2001/08] | WO1999EP02868 | Priority number, date | DE1998119610 | 04.05.1998 Original published format: DE 19819610 | [2001/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9957513 | Date: | 11.11.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1076807 | Date: | 21.02.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1076807 | Date: | 09.01.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01C9/20 | [2001/08] | CPC: |
G01C9/20 (EP,US);
G01C2009/066 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, LI, SE [2001/08] | Title | German: | OPTISCHER NEIGUNGSMESSER | [2001/08] | English: | OPTICAL CLINOMETER | [2001/08] | French: | CLINOMETRE OPTIQUE | [2001/08] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/08] | 17.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE19610941 (ZEISS CARL JENA GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1; | [A]CH673707 (KERN & CO AG) [A] 1 |