Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1079911

EP1079911 - DEVICE FOR OBTAINING A DESALINATED SOLUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  05.07.2002
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.07.2002Refusal of applicationpublished on 21.08.2002  [2002/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dengler, Hermann
Gartenstrasse 31
71229 Leonberg / DE
[2001/10]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2001/10]
Representative(s)Wasmuth, Rolf , et al
Patentanwälte
Dipl.Ing. W. Jackisch & Partner mbB
Menzelstrasse 40
70192 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/10]Wasmuth, Rolf, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwalt W. Jackisch & Partner Menzelstrasse 40
70192 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date99920823.430.04.1999
[2001/10]
WO1999EP02939
Priority number, dateDE199811962004.05.1998         Original published format: DE 19819620
[2001/10]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9956860
Date:11.11.1999
Language:DE
[1999/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1079911
Date:07.03.2001
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.1999
[2001/10]
Search report(s)International search reportEP11.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:B01D61/08, B01D61/18
[2001/10]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   ES,   GR,   IT,   LI [2001/10]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR GEWINNUNG EINER ENTSALZTEN LÖSUNG[2001/10]
English:DEVICE FOR OBTAINING A DESALINATED SOLUTION[2001/10]
French:DISPOSITIF POUR PREPARER UNE SOLUTION DESSALEE[2001/10]
Entry into regional phase05.10.2000National basic fee paid 
05.10.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
05.10.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.11.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
05.10.2000Examination requested  [2001/10]
06.09.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
18.03.2002Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2002/34]
28.03.2002Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[DYA]DE3914940  (LAUER GUENTER [CH]) [DY] 1-6,10,12 * abstract * * column 3, line 11 - line 20 * * column 4, line 12 - line 33 * * column 4, line 46 - column 5, line 1 * * column 6, line 21 - line 53 * * column 7, line 14 - line 21 * * column 8, line 65 - column 9, line 14 * * column 9, line 50 - column 10, line 47 * * column 12, line 27 - column 13, line 6 * * column 14, line 26 - line 32 * [A] 11,13;
 [DY]JPS6291204  ;
 [A]SU1528527  ;
 [DA]DE19545277  (UT & S UMWELTTECHNIK UND SERVI [DE]) [DA] 1,2,6,10 * abstract * * column 1, line 63 - column 2, line 26 * * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 51 * * column 4, line 15 - line 64 *
 [DY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870929), vol. 011, no. 300, Database accession no. (C - 449), [DY] 1-6,10,12 * abstract *
    [] - 1, vol. 87, no. 22, Database accession no. 87-153964, XP002112953 [ ] * abstract *
 [A]  - 1, vol. 90, no. 26, Database accession no. 90-200241, XP002112954 [A] 1,10 * abstract *