Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0998655

EP0998655 - HEAT EXCHANGER, IN PARTICULAR MOTOR VEHICLE CONDENSER AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.08.2003
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.08.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.09.2003  [2003/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VALEO THERMIQUE MOTEUR S.A.
8, rue Louis-Lormand
78321 La Verrière / FR
[2000/19]
Inventor(s)01 / HUBERT, Sylvain
60, rue Bazin
F-51100 Reims / FR
[2000/19]
Application number, filing date99920886.119.05.1999
[2000/19]
WO1999FR01187
Priority number, dateFR1998000654625.05.1998         Original published format: FR 9806546
[2000/19]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9961859
Date:02.12.1999
Language:FR
[1999/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0998655
Date:10.05.2000
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.1999
[2000/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0998655
Date:02.10.2002
Language:FR
[2002/40]
Search report(s)International search reportEP02.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:F28F9/00, F28F9/02, B60K11/04, B21D39/03
[2000/19]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   GB,   IT [2000/19]
TitleGerman:WÄRMETAUSCHER, INSBESONDERE VERFLÜSSIGER FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUG UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG[2000/19]
English:HEAT EXCHANGER, IN PARTICULAR MOTOR VEHICLE CONDENSER AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME[2000/19]
French:ECHANGEUR DE CHALEUR, EN PARTICULIER CONDENSEUR DE VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE, ET PROCEDE POUR SA FABRICATION[2000/19]
Entry into regional phase22.02.2000National basic fee paid 
22.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
22.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/19]
18.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
24.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.06.2002Fee for grant paid
18.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.07.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
19.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[DA]EP0484004  (SHOWA ALUMINIUM CO LTD [JP]) [DA] 1 * column 4, line 14 - column 4, line 50; figure 3 *;
 [A]EP0440400  (SHOWA ALUMINIUM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 35 - column 5, line 32; figures 3-5 *;
 [A]US5603153  (ZMYSLOWSKI MARK [US]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 37 - column 5, line 26; figures 1-3,9M *;
 [A]JPH05332694
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940322), vol. 018, no. 168, Database accession no. (M - 1580), [A] 1 * abstract *