Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1254439

EP1254439 - TELEPAYMENT SYSTEM FOR PAYMENT CARD MADE SECURE BY DIGITAL SIGNATURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.06.2007
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.06.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.07.2007  [2007/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Taieb Baillie, Thierry
31, Avenue du General Sarrail
75016 Paris / FR
[2004/17]
Former [2002/45]For all designated states
Taieb Baillie, Thierry
51, rue laborde
75008 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2002/45]
Application number, filing date99920923.226.05.1999
[2002/45]
WO1999FR01231
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0074008
Date:07.12.2000
Language:FR
[2000/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1254439
Date:06.11.2002
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2000
[2002/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.12.2000
ClassificationInternational:G07F7/10, G07F19/00
[2002/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/45]
TitleGerman:FERNBEZAHLUNSSYSTEM FÜR BEZAHLUNGSKARTEN GESICHERT DURCH DIGITALE UNTERSCHRIFT[2002/45]
English:TELEPAYMENT SYSTEM FOR PAYMENT CARD MADE SECURE BY DIGITAL SIGNATURE[2002/45]
French:SYSTEME DE TELE-PAIEMENT SECURISE PAR SIGNATURE NUMERIQUE POUR CARTE DE PAIEMENT[2002/45]
Entry into regional phase17.05.2002National basic fee paid 
05.09.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
05.09.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.12.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
05.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/45]
30.06.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.11.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/29]
26.02.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2007/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
23.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
01.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
10.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
03.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
23.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
01.08.2002AT   M01   Fee paid on   05.09.2002
01.08.2002BE   M01   Fee paid on   05.09.2002
01.08.2002CH   M01   Fee paid on   05.09.2002
01.08.2002CY   M01   Fee paid on   05.09.2002
01.08.2002DE   M01   Fee paid on   05.09.2002
01.08.2002DK   M01   Fee paid on   05.09.2002
01.08.2002ES   M01   Fee paid on   05.09.2002
01.08.2002FI   M01   Fee paid on   05.09.2002
01.08.2002FR   M01   Fee paid on   05.09.2002
01.08.2002GB   M01   Fee paid on   05.09.2002
01.08.2002GR   M01   Fee paid on   05.09.2002
01.08.2002IE   M01   Fee paid on   05.09.2002
01.08.2002IT   M01   Fee paid on   05.09.2002
01.08.2002LU   M01   Fee paid on   05.09.2002
01.08.2002MC   M01   Fee paid on   05.09.2002
01.08.2002NL   M01   Fee paid on   05.09.2002
01.08.2002PT   M01   Fee paid on   05.09.2002
01.08.2002SE   M01   Fee paid on   05.09.2002
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
01.08.2002M01   Fee paid on   05.09.2002
Additional fee for renewal fee
26.12.200103   M06   Fee paid on   17.05.2002
31.05.200204   M06   Fee paid on   23.07.2002
31.05.200305   M06   Fee paid on   01.12.2003
31.05.200507   M06   Fee paid on   03.08.2005
31.05.200608   M06   Fee paid on   23.09.2006
Cited inInternational search[YA]EP0174016  (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-3,5 * the whole document * [A] 4;
 [Y]US5317636  (VIZCAINO GERARDO [US]) [Y] 1-3,5 * column A; figure -; claim - * * column 3, line 42 - column 8, line 23 *;
 [A]DE3222288  (WEISE GUSTAV [DE]);
 [A]WO8603040  (INTELLIGARD INT INC [US]);
 [E]FR2771533  (BAILLIE TAIB THIERRY [FR]) [E] 1-5 * the whole document *