EP1081132 - HYDROXAMIC ACID DERIVATIVES AND MEDICINAL UTILIZATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Pharma Corporation 6-9, Hiranomachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0046 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/05] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Pharma Corporation 6-9, Hiranomachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0046 / JP | ||
Former [2001/10] | For all designated states Welfide Corporation 6-9, Hiranomachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0046 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOTOU, Tomokazu, Welfide Corp. Drug Discovery Lab. 25-1, Shodaiohtani 2-chome Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-1153 / JP | 02 /
TAKEDA, Shinji, Welfide Corp.Drug Development Lab. 955, Oaza-Koiwai, Yoshitomimachi Chikujo-gun, Fukuoka 871-8550 / JP | 03 /
MAEDA, Kazuhiro, Welfide Corp. Drug Discovery Lab. 25-1, Shodaiohtani 2-chome Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-1153 / JP | 04 /
YOSHIDA, Tomohiro, Welfide Corp.Drug Discovery Lab 25-1, Shodaiohtani 2-chome Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-1153 / JP | 05 /
SUGIYAMA, Naoki, Welfide Corp. Drug Discovery Lab. 7-25, Koyata 3-chome, Iruma-shi Saitama 358-0026 / JP | 06 /
TAKEMOTO, Tadahiro, Welfide Corp. Drug Disc. Lab. 25-1, Shodaiohtani 2-chome Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-1153 / JP | [2004/22] |
Former [2004/19] | 01 /
GOTOU, Tomokazu, Welfide Corp. Drug Discovery Lab. 25-1, Shodaiohtani 2-chome Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-1153 / JP | ||
02 /
TAKEDA, Shinji, Welfide Corp.Drug Development Lab. 955, Oaza-Koiwai, Yoshitomimachi Chikujo-gun, Fukuoka 871-8550 / JP | |||
03 /
MAEDA, Kazuhiro, Welfide Corp. Drug Discovery Lab. 25-1, Shodaiohtani 2-chome Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-1153 / JP | |||
04 /
YOSHIDA, Tomohiro, Welfide Corp.Drug Discovery Lab 25-1, Shodaiohtani 2-chome Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-1153 / JP | |||
05 /
SUGIYAMA, Naoki, Welfide Corp. Drug Discovery Lab. 7-25, Koyata 3-chome,Iruma-shi Saitama 358-0026 / JP | |||
06 /
TAKEMOTO, Tadahiro, Welfide Corp. Drug Disc. Lab. 25-1, Shodaiohtani 2-chome Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-1153 / JP | |||
Former [2001/10] | 01 /
GOTOU, Tomokazu, Welfide Corp. Drug Discovery Lab. 25-1, Shodaiohtani 2-chome Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-1153 / JP | ||
02 /
TAKEDA, Shinji, Welfide Corp.Drug Development Lab. 955, Oaza-Koiwai, Yoshitomimachi Chikujo-gun, Fukuoka 871-8550 / JP | |||
03 /
MAEDA, Kazuhiro, Welfide Corp. Drug Discovery Lab. 25-1, Shodaiohtani 2-chome Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-1153 / JP | |||
04 /
YOSHIDA, Tomohiro, Welfide Corp.Drug Discovery Lab 25-1, Shodaiohtani 2-chome Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-1153 / JP | |||
05 /
SUGIYAMA, Naoki, Welfide Corp. Drug Discovery Lab. 25-1, Shodaiohtani 2-chome Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-1153 / JP | |||
06 /
TAKEMOTO, Tadahiro, Welfide Corp. Drug Disc. Lab. 25-1, Shodaiohtani 2-chome Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-1153 / JP | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/10] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte, von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus) 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 99921188.1 | 19.05.1999 | [2001/10] | WO1999JP02631 | Priority number, date | JP19980141304 | 22.05.1998 Original published format: JP 14130498 | [2001/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9961412 | Date: | 02.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1081132 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1081132 | Date: | 10.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.12.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07C259/06, C07C233/31 | [2001/10] | CPC: |
C07D209/48 (EP,US);
C07C259/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61P19/02 (EP);
C07D209/46 (EP,US);
C07D233/72 (EP,US);
C07D307/52 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/10] | Title | German: | HYDROXAMSÄUREDERIVATE UND IHRE MEDIZINISCHE ANWENDUNG | [2001/10] | English: | HYDROXAMIC ACID DERIVATIVES AND MEDICINAL UTILIZATION THEREOF | [2001/10] | French: | DERIVES D'ACIDE HYDROXAMIQUE ET UTILISATION MEDICINALE DE CES DERIVES | [2001/10] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2000 | Translation filed | 13.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2000 | Search fee paid | 13.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 13.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/10] | 10.12.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 30.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.03.2004 | BE | 10.03.2004 | CH | 10.03.2004 | CY | 10.03.2004 | FI | 10.03.2004 | LI | 10.03.2004 | NL | 10.03.2004 | IE | 19.05.2004 | LU | 19.05.2004 | MC | 31.05.2004 | DK | 10.06.2004 | GR | 10.06.2004 | SE | 10.06.2004 | PT | 10.08.2004 | [2008/17] |
Former [2007/22] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
BE | 10.03.2004 | ||
CH | 10.03.2004 | ||
CY | 10.03.2004 | ||
FI | 10.03.2004 | ||
LI | 10.03.2004 | ||
NL | 10.03.2004 | ||
IE | 19.05.2004 | ||
LU | 19.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
DK | 10.06.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
BE | 10.03.2004 | ||
CH | 10.03.2004 | ||
FI | 10.03.2004 | ||
LI | 10.03.2004 | ||
NL | 10.03.2004 | ||
IE | 19.05.2004 | ||
LU | 19.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
DK | 10.06.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
BE | 10.03.2004 | ||
CH | 10.03.2004 | ||
FI | 10.03.2004 | ||
LI | 10.03.2004 | ||
NL | 10.03.2004 | ||
LU | 19.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
DK | 10.06.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
BE | 10.03.2004 | ||
CH | 10.03.2004 | ||
FI | 10.03.2004 | ||
LI | 10.03.2004 | ||
NL | 10.03.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
DK | 10.06.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
BE | 10.03.2004 | ||
CH | 10.03.2004 | ||
FI | 10.03.2004 | ||
LI | 10.03.2004 | ||
NL | 10.03.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/05] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
BE | 10.03.2004 | ||
CH | 10.03.2004 | ||
FI | 10.03.2004 | ||
LI | 10.03.2004 | ||
NL | 10.03.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
BE | 10.03.2004 | ||
CH | 10.03.2004 | ||
FI | 10.03.2004 | ||
LI | 10.03.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
CH | 10.03.2004 | ||
FI | 10.03.2004 | ||
LI | 10.03.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/43] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
FI | 10.03.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 10.03.2004 | |
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 10.03.2004 | |
SE | 10.06.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JPH08505605 ; | [AP]WO9830541 (ABBOTT LAB [US]) |