Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1086950

EP1086950 - HETEROCYCLIC INDOLE DERIVATIVES AND MONO- OR DIAZAINDOLE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.08.2011
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 26.06.2013  [2013/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CHUGAI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA
5-1, Ukima 5-chome, Kita-ku
Tokyo, 115-8543 / JP
[2010/39]
Former [2001/13]For all designated states
CHUGAI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA
5-1, Ukima 5-chome, Kita-ku
Tokyo, 115-8543 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / MATSUOKA, Hiroharu, c/o Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha
135, Komakado 1-chome
Gotenba-shi Shizuoka 412-8513 / JP
02 / KATO, Nobuaki, c/o Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha
135, Komakado 1-chome
Gotenba-shi Shizuoka 412-8513 / JP
03 / TAKAHASHI, Tadakatsu, c/o Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha
135, Komakado 1-chome
Gotenba-shi Shizuoka 412-8513 / JP
04 / MARUYAMA, Noriaki, c/o Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha
135, Komakado 1-chome
Gotenba-shi Shizuoka 412-8513 / JP
05 / ISHIZAWA, Takenori, c/o Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha
135, Komakado 1-chome
Gotenba-shi Shizuoka 412-8513 / JP
06 / SUZUKI, Yukio, c/o Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha
135, Komakado 1-chome
Gotenba-shi Shizuoka 412-8513 / JP
 [2010/39]
Former [2001/13]01 / MATSUOKA, Hiroharu Chugai Seiyaku K.K.
135, Komakado 1-chome
Gotenba-shi Shizuoka 412-8513 / JP
02 / KATO, Nobuaki Chugai Seiyaku K.K.
135, Komakado 1-chome
Gotenba-shi Shizuoka 412-8513 / JP
03 / TAKAHASHI, Tadakatsu Chugai Seiyaku K.K.
135, Komakado 1-chome
Gotenba-shi Shizuoka 412-8513 / JP
04 / MARUYAMA, Noriaki Chigai Seiyaku K.K.
135, Komakado 1-chome
Gotenba-shi Shizuoka 412-8513 / JP
05 / ISHIZAWA, Takenori Chugai Seiyaku K.K.
135, Komakado 1-chome
Gotenba-shi Shizuoka 412-8513 / JP
06 / SUZUKI, Yukio Chugai Seiyaku K.K.
135, Komakado 1-chome
Gotenba-shi Shizuoka 412-8513 / JP
Representative(s)Green, Mark Charles , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Euston House
24 Eversholt Street
London NW1 1AD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/45]Green, Mark Charles , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 30 Welbeck Street
London W1G 8ER / GB
Former [2001/13]Eddowes, Simon , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, 30 Welbeck Street
London W1G 8ER / GB
Application number, filing date99921245.925.05.1999
[2001/13]
WO1999JP02718
Priority number, dateJP1998014395726.05.1998         Original published format: JP 14395798
JP1998032355313.11.1998         Original published format: JP 32355398
[2001/13]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9961436
Date:02.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1086950
Date:28.03.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.1999
[2001/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1086950
Date:29.09.2010
Language:EN
[2010/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP02.12.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.11.2002
ClassificationInternational:C07D401/04, C07D401/06, C07D403/04, C07D405/04, C07D405/06, C07D413/04, C07D417/04, C07D417/06, C07D471/04, C07D487/04, C07D407/04, C07D407/06, A61K31/40, A61K31/50
[2010/23]
Former International [2002/50]C07D401/04, C07D401/06, C07D403/04, C07D405/04, C07D405/06, C07D413/04, C07D417/04, C07D417/06, C07D471/04, C07D487/04, C07D407/04, C07D407/06, A61K31/40, A61K31/50, // (C07D471/04, 221:00, 209:00),(C07D407/04, 307:00, 209:00)
Former International [2001/13]C07D401/04, C07D401/06, C07D403/04, C07D405/04, C07D405/06, C07D413/04, C07D417/04, C07D417/06, C07D471/04, C07D487/04, A61K31/40, A61K31/41, A61K31/42, A61K31/435, A61K31/44, A61K31/495
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/13]
TitleGerman:HETEROZYKLISCHE INDOLDERIVATE UND MONO- ODER DIAZAINDOL-DERIVATE[2001/13]
English:HETEROCYCLIC INDOLE DERIVATIVES AND MONO- OR DIAZAINDOLE DERIVATIVES[2001/13]
French:DERIVES D'INDOLE HETEROCYCLIQUES ET DERIVES DE MONO OU DE DI-AZAINDOLE[2001/13]
Entry into regional phase11.12.2000Translation filed 
11.12.2000National basic fee paid 
11.12.2000Search fee paid 
11.12.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
11.12.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.06.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
11.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/13]
26.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.05.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.11.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.12.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.04.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.05.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.08.2010Fee for grant paid
18.08.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.06.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
07.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
19.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
21.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
22.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
24.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
28.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
13.05.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
20.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
16.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT29.09.2010
BE29.09.2010
CY29.09.2010
DK29.09.2010
FI29.09.2010
IT29.09.2010
NL29.09.2010
SE29.09.2010
GR30.12.2010
ES09.01.2011
PT31.01.2011
IE25.05.2011
LU25.05.2011
CH31.05.2011
LI31.05.2011
MC31.05.2011
[2013/26]
Former [2013/25]AT29.09.2010
BE29.09.2010
DK29.09.2010
FI29.09.2010
IT29.09.2010
NL29.09.2010
SE29.09.2010
GR30.12.2010
ES09.01.2011
PT31.01.2011
IE25.05.2011
LU25.05.2011
CH31.05.2011
LI31.05.2011
MC31.05.2011
Former [2012/20]AT29.09.2010
BE29.09.2010
DK29.09.2010
FI29.09.2010
IT29.09.2010
NL29.09.2010
SE29.09.2010
GR30.12.2010
ES09.01.2011
PT31.01.2011
IE25.05.2011
CH31.05.2011
LI31.05.2011
MC31.05.2011
Former [2012/07]AT29.09.2010
BE29.09.2010
DK29.09.2010
FI29.09.2010
IT29.09.2010
NL29.09.2010
SE29.09.2010
GR30.12.2010
ES09.01.2011
PT31.01.2011
CH31.05.2011
LI31.05.2011
MC31.05.2011
Former [2012/05]AT29.09.2010
BE29.09.2010
DK29.09.2010
FI29.09.2010
IT29.09.2010
NL29.09.2010
SE29.09.2010
GR30.12.2010
ES09.01.2011
PT31.01.2011
MC31.05.2011
Former [2011/40]AT29.09.2010
BE29.09.2010
DK29.09.2010
FI29.09.2010
IT29.09.2010
NL29.09.2010
SE29.09.2010
GR30.12.2010
ES09.01.2011
PT31.01.2011
Former [2011/35]AT29.09.2010
BE29.09.2010
FI29.09.2010
IT29.09.2010
NL29.09.2010
SE29.09.2010
GR30.12.2010
ES09.01.2011
PT31.01.2011
Former [2011/27]AT29.09.2010
BE29.09.2010
FI29.09.2010
IT29.09.2010
NL29.09.2010
SE29.09.2010
GR30.12.2010
PT31.01.2011
Former [2011/26]AT29.09.2010
FI29.09.2010
IT29.09.2010
NL29.09.2010
SE29.09.2010
GR30.12.2010
PT31.01.2011
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO9730030  ;
 [D]JPH1077266  (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD);
 [Y]EP0535925  (MERCK FROSST CANADA INC [CA]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract *
 [Y]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1997, no. 40, Database accession no. 1997-434718, XP002217417 & WO9730030 A 19970821 (CHUGAI PHARM CO LTD) [Y] 1-15 * abstract *
International search[A]JPH07215966  (MERCK FROSST CANADA INC);
 [A]WO9606840  (MERCK FROSST CANADA INC [CA], et al);
 [AP]JPH10168066  (PFIZER PHARMACEUT INC)