EP1095173 - HYDROGEN ELECTROCHEMICAL SYSTEM ENVIRONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.03.2008 [2008/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Proton Energy Systems 50 Inwood Road Rocky Hill, CT 06067 / US | [2001/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOULTHROP, Lawrence, C., Jr. 244 Carriage Way Windsor, CT 06095 / US | 02 /
SPERANZA, A., John 26 Penn Drive West Hartford, CT 06119 / US | 03 /
BYRON, Robert, H., Jr. 678 Beaumont Highway Lebanon, CT 06249 / US | [2001/18] | Representative(s) | Brinkmann & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | Stenger, Watzke & Ring Patentanwälte Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 70 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 99921624.5 | 03.05.1999 | [2001/18] | WO1999US09661 | Priority number, date | US19980073031 | 05.05.1998 Original published format: US 73031 | [2001/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9957335 | Date: | 11.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1095173 | Date: | 02.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.11.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C25B1/02, C25B1/00, C25B15/00, H01M8/18, H01M8/04 | [2001/18] | CPC: |
H01M10/42 (EP,US);
C25B1/02 (EP,US);
C25B15/00 (EP,US);
H01M8/04 (EP,US);
H01M8/247 (EP,US);
H01M10/345 (EP,US);
H01M8/186 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02E60/50 (EP,US);
Y02P20/129 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/18] | Title | German: | UMGEBUNG FÜR WASSERSTOFFELEKTROLYTISCHES SYSTEM | [2001/18] | English: | HYDROGEN ELECTROCHEMICAL SYSTEM ENVIRONMENT | [2001/18] | French: | ENVIRONNEMENT POUR SYSTEME ELECTROCHIMIQUE A HYDROGENE | [2001/18] | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2000 | Search fee paid | 04.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 04.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/18] | 26.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH0714589 ; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1995, no. 12, Database accession no. 1995-086608, XP002381428 & JPH0714589 A 19950117 (TOSHIBA KK) [X] 1-3,12 * abstract * | International search | [A]US5330858 (SHUNDOU HIROYUKI [JP], et al); | [A]US5612149 (HARTVIGSEN JOSEPH J [US], et al); | [AP]US5840437 (DIETHELM ROLAND [CH]) |