EP1093625 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR INTRADAY NETTING PAYMENT FINALITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.04.2006 [2006/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Clearing House Service Company L.L.C. 100 Broad Street New York, NY 10004 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/17] | For all designated states The Clearing House Service Company L.L.C. 100 Broad Street New York, NY 1004 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COTTON, Robert M. Apartment 304, 2350 Broadway New York, NY 10024 / US | 02 /
THOMAS, George, F. 111 Middlesex Avenue Oakdale, NY 11769 / US | 03 /
PAWELCZYK, Joseph, S. 9 Wyckoff Way Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [2001/17] | Representative(s) | Rupp, Christian Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/17] | Rupp, Christian, Dipl.Phys. Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99921635.1 | 05.05.1999 | [2001/17] | WO1999US09698 | Priority number, date | US19980084223P | 05.05.1998 Original published format: US 84223 P | [2001/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9957665 | Date: | 11.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1093625 | Date: | 25.04.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.11.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60, G07F19/00 | [2004/27] | CPC: |
G06Q40/02 (EP,US);
G06Q20/102 (EP,US);
G06Q40/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/17] | G06F17/60 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/17] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM ABSCHLIESSEN VON BEZAHLUNGEN INNERHALB EINES TAGES | [2001/17] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR INTRADAY NETTING PAYMENT FINALITY | [2001/17] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE FINALISER LE PAIEMENT D'UNE COMPENSATION INTERNE DANS LA JOURNEE | [2001/17] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2000 | Search fee paid | 20.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 20.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/17] | 26.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/15] | 07.11.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search | International search | [A]US5262942 (EARLE DENNIS M [US]); | [A]US5465206 (HILT JAMES J [US], et al); | [A]US5649117 (LANDRY GEORGE W [US]); | [A]US5677955 (DOGGETT JOHN [US], et al); | [A] - LEE P. C. K., GHOSH S., "NOVAHID: A NOVEL ARCHITECTURE FOR ASYNCHRONOUS, HIERARCHICAL, INTERNATIONAL, DISTRIBUTED, REAL-TIME PAYMENTS PROCESSING.", IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS., IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY., US, US, (19940801), vol. 12., no. 06., doi:10.1109/49.310964, ISSN 0733-8716, pages 1072 - 1087., XP000491332 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/49.310964 | by applicant | US6090300 |