Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1079851 RSS: dossier

Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1383
08.07.2016 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) Opposition 1
08.07.2016 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) Opposition 1
05.07.2016 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
05.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
05.04.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
05.04.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
30.03.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.03.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
24.03.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
24.03.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
24.03.2016 Decision revoking the European Patent (patent proprietor) Opposition 3
24.03.2016 Decision revoking the European patent (opponent) Opposition 3
14.12.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
14.12.2015 Communication concerning surcharge and failure to observe time limit Opposition 2
30.07.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Opposition 1
30.07.2015 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 3
30.07.2015 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 4
23.07.2015 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
30.06.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.06.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
16.06.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.06.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
28.05.2015 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 21
28.05.2015 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
28.05.2015 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
27.01.2015 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 5
15.01.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.01.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
12.01.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
12.01.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
18.12.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.12.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
15.12.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
15.12.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
15.12.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
15.12.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
15.12.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
15.12.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
15.12.2014 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 29
17.10.2014 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 10
17.10.2014 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 10
19.09.2014 F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation Appeal 2
15.09.2014 F3039 Attendance note about a phone conversation and continuation sheet Appeal 2
25.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
25.07.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
25.07.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
24.07.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
18.07.2014 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
18.07.2014 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
14.07.2014 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
16.05.2014 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
08.08.2013 Communication of amended entries Appeal 1
31.07.2013 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
31.05.2013 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
31.05.2013 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
17.05.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
17.05.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
17.05.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
24.10.2012 F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
28.09.2012 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
14.03.2012 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Appeal 1
12.03.2012 Document concerning representation Appeal 1
05.10.2011 F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
15.07.2010 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
07.07.2010 Claims Appeal 2
07.07.2010 Claims Appeal 2
07.07.2010 Claims Appeal 1
07.07.2010 Claims Appeal 2
07.07.2010 Claims Appeal 3
07.07.2010 Claims Appeal 3
07.07.2010 Claims Appeal 2
07.07.2010 Claims Appeal 2
07.07.2010 Claims Appeal 4
07.07.2010 Claims Appeal 2
07.07.2010 Claims Appeal 2
07.07.2010 Claims Appeal 2
07.07.2010 Claims Appeal 1
07.07.2010 Claims Appeal 2
07.07.2010 Claims Appeal 2
07.07.2010 Claims Appeal 2
07.07.2010 Claims Appeal 2
07.07.2010 Claims Appeal 2
07.07.2010 Claims Appeal 3
07.07.2010 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 23
07.07.2010 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 19
17.06.2010 F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
05.05.2010 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
22.04.2010 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
19.04.2010 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
18.03.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
10.03.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
03.03.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.02.2010 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 9
26.02.2010 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
26.02.2010 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
26.02.2010 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 9
26.02.2010 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 8
26.02.2010 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 2
26.02.2010 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 1
26.02.2010 Text intended for grant Opposition 54
17.02.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
17.02.2010 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Opposition 1
12.02.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.02.2010 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Opposition 6
05.02.2010 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Opposition 1
28.09.2009 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
16.09.2009 Claims Opposition 2
16.09.2009 Description Opposition 8
16.09.2009 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
16.09.2009 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.09.2009 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) Opposition 7
10.09.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.09.2009 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 12
07.09.2009 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
04.09.2009 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 12
04.09.2009 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
13.08.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.08.2009 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
24.07.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.07.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.07.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.07.2009 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 12
16.07.2009 Claims Opposition 4
16.07.2009 Claims Opposition 2
16.07.2009 Claims Opposition 2
16.07.2009 Claims Opposition 2
16.07.2009 Claims Opposition 2
16.07.2009 Claims Opposition 2
16.07.2009 Claims Opposition 3
16.07.2009 Claims Opposition 2
16.07.2009 Claims Opposition 3
16.07.2009 Claims Opposition 2
16.07.2009 Claims Opposition 3
16.07.2009 Claims Opposition 1
16.07.2009 Claims Opposition 2
16.07.2009 Claims Opposition 2
16.07.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 23
16.07.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
16.07.2009 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 15
15.07.2009 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.07.2009 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.04.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
23.04.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
22.04.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
22.04.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.04.2009 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
15.04.2009 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.04.2009 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.04.2009 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.04.2009 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.04.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.04.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.04.2009 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
06.04.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) Opposition 1
03.04.2009 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
03.04.2009 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Opposition 1
02.04.2009 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
02.04.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) Opposition 1
01.04.2009 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
01.04.2009 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Opposition 1
30.03.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.03.2009 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
30.03.2009 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
30.03.2009 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.03.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) Opposition 1
26.03.2009 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.03.2009 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.03.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
24.03.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.03.2009 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
24.03.2009 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.03.2009 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.03.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) Opposition 1
24.03.2009 Letter which had not been notified Opposition 13
24.03.2009 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Opposition 1
23.03.2009 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
09.03.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.03.2009 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
06.03.2009 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Opposition 1
05.03.2009 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
04.03.2009 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
04.03.2009 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Opposition 1
24.02.2009 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 7
24.02.2009 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
24.02.2009 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 1
24.02.2009 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.02.2009 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.02.2009 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
20.11.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.11.2008 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 10
13.11.2008 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 3
13.11.2008 Claims Opposition 3
13.11.2008 Claims Opposition 2
13.11.2008 Claims Opposition 2
13.11.2008 Claims Opposition 2
13.11.2008 Claims Opposition 4
13.11.2008 Claims Opposition 2
13.11.2008 Claims Opposition 1
13.11.2008 Claims Opposition 2
13.11.2008 Claims Opposition 2
13.11.2008 Claims Opposition 2
13.11.2008 Claims Opposition 2
13.11.2008 Claims Opposition 2
13.11.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
13.11.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
13.11.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
13.11.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
13.11.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
13.11.2008 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 20
15.09.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.09.2008 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
11.09.2008 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
09.09.2008 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
09.05.2008 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
09.05.2008 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
11.04.2008 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
02.04.2008 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 6
02.04.2008 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 4
02.04.2008 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 5
02.04.2008 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 5
02.04.2008 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 24
02.04.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
02.04.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
02.04.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
02.04.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
02.04.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
02.04.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
02.04.2008 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
02.04.2008 Notice of opposition Opposition 13
04.10.2007 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
14.09.2007 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 8
14.09.2007 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 1
08.06.2007 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
15.05.2007 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
15.05.2007 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
15.05.2007 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
14.05.2007 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
02.05.2007 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 2
02.05.2007 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 1
05.01.2007 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
05.01.2007 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
05.01.2007 Text intended for grant Search / examination 76
20.12.2006 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
15.09.2006 Claims Search / examination 2
15.09.2006 Claims Search / examination 3
15.09.2006 Description Search / examination 4
15.09.2006 Description Search / examination 5
15.09.2006 Description Search / examination 8
15.09.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 10
15.09.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
14.09.2006 Fax filed during the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 36
12.05.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
12.05.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.11.2005 Claims Search / examination 2
02.11.2005 Claims Search / examination 3
02.11.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
20.09.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
20.09.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.06.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
24.06.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
27.05.2005 General enquiry Search / examination 1
14.09.2004 Miscellaneous requests concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 1
21.06.2004 Communication of amended entries Search / examination 2
21.06.2004 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
05.06.2004 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
04.05.2004 Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order Search / examination 1
23.04.2004 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
21.04.2004 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
16.02.2004 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
03.02.2004 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
03.02.2004 European search report Search / examination 1
31.07.2002 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
22.06.2001 Non-scannable object Search / examination 1
22.06.2001 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
22.06.2001 Sequence listing Search / examination 27
20.06.2001 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 2
07.05.2001 Deficiencies in sequence listing Search / examination 3
24.01.2001 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
15.12.2000 Claims Search / examination 2
15.12.2000 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
15.12.2000 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
12.12.2000 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 9
10.02.2000 Copy of the corrected international search report Search / examination 3
10.02.2000 Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 80
01.12.1999 Priority document Search / examination 88
01.12.1999 Priority document Search / examination 34
25.11.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
18.11.1999 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
18.11.1999 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 74