Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1078097

EP1078097 - CELL-FREE CHIMERAPLASTY AND EUKARYOTIC USE OF HETERODUPLEX MUTATIONAL VECTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.04.2004
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.04.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.06.2004  [2004/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kimeragen Inc.
300 Pheasant Run
Newtown, PA 18940 / US
[2001/09]
Inventor(s)01 / KMIEC, Eric, B.
1570 Reaper Court
Yardley, PA 19067 / US
02 / GAMPER, Howard, B.
904 Locust Street
Philadelphia, PA 19107 / US
03 / COLE-STRAUSS, Allyson, D.
11 Hampden Avenue
Narberth, PA 19072 / US
 [2001/09]
Representative(s)Horner, Martin Grenville , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
Aurora
120 Bothwell Street
Glasgow
G2 7JS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/09]Horner, Martin Grenville , et al
Cruikshank & Fairweather 19 Royal Exchange Square
Glasgow G1 3AE Scotland / GB
Application number, filing date99921929.812.05.1999
[2001/09]
WO1999US10519
Priority number, dateUS1998007806412.05.1998         Original published format: US 78064
[2001/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9958702
Date:18.11.1999
Language:EN
[1999/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1078097
Date:28.02.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.1999
[2001/09]
Search report(s)International search reportUS18.11.1999
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP18.04.2002
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/10, C12N15/87
[2002/06]
Former International [2001/09]C12N15/87
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/09]
TitleGerman:ZELLFREIE CHIMERAPLASTIE UND EUKARYONTISCHE VERWENDUNG VON HETERODUPLEX-MUTATIONSVEKTOREN.[2001/09]
English:CELL-FREE CHIMERAPLASTY AND EUKARYOTIC USE OF HETERODUPLEX MUTATIONAL VECTORS[2001/09]
French:CHIMERAPLASTIE ACELLULAIRE ET UTILISATION EUCARYOTE DE VECTEURS HETERODUPLEX MUTATIONNELS[2001/09]
Entry into regional phase08.12.2000National basic fee paid 
08.12.2000Search fee paid 
08.12.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
08.12.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.12.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
08.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/09]
02.12.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/24]
07.01.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
28.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200305   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9748714  (UNIV JEFFERSON [US]) [A] 1-31 * the whole document *;
 [A]  COLE-STRAUSS ALLYSON ET AL, "Correction of the mutation responsible for sickle cell anemia by an RNA-DNA oligonucleotide.", SCIENCE (WASHINGTON D C), (1996), vol. 273, no. 5280, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 1386 - 1389, XP000999440 [A] 1-31 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.273.5280.1386
 [A]  HOLMES J JR ET AL, "STRAND-SPECIFIC MISMATCH CORRECTION IN NUCLEAR EXTRACTS OF HUMAN AND DROSOPHILA-MELANOGASTER CELL LINES", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES, 1990, (1990), vol. 87, no. 15, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 5837 - 5841, XP002185359 [A] 1-31 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.87.15.5837
 [A]  LI J J ET AL, "SV-40 DNA REPLICATION IN-VITRO SPECIFICITY OF INITIATION AND EVIDENCE FOR BIDIRECTIONAL REPLICATION", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY, (1985), vol. 5, no. 6, ISSN 0270-7306, pages 1238 - 1246, XP001008007 [A] 1-31 * the whole document *
 [PX]  COLE-STRAUSS ALLYSON ET AL, "Targeted gene repair directed by the chimeric RNA/DNA oligonucleotide in a mammalian cell-free extract.", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (19990301), vol. 27, no. 5, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 1323 - 1330, XP002185360 [PX] 1-31 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/27.5.1323
International search[A]US5731181  (KMIEC ERIC B [US]);
 [A]  - SAMUELS D. S., ET AL., "OLIGONUCLEOTIDE-MEDIATED GENETIC TRANSFORMATION OF BORRELIA BURGDORFERI.", Microbiology, SOCIETY FOR GENERAL MICROBIOLOGY, GB, GB, (19970101), vol. 143., ISSN 1350-0872, pages 519 - 522., XP002921528