Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1086541

EP1086541 - SIGNAL DECODING WITH OR WITHOUT SECOND SYNCHRONIZATION WORD IN A MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.12.2005
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.12.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.02.2006  [2006/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ericsson Inc.
6300 Legacy Drive MS EVW 2-C-2
Plano, TX 75024 / US
[N/P]
Former [2004/02]For all designated states
Ericsson Inc.
6300 Legacy, MS EVW 2-C-2
Plano, TX 75024 / US
Former [2001/13]For all designated states
Ericsson Inc.
7001 Development Drive
Research Triangle Park, N.C. 27709 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DENT, Paul, W.
637 Eagle Point Road
Pittsboro, NC 27312 / US
02 / RAITH, Krister
805-A Park Ridge
Durham, NC 27713 / US
 [2001/13]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/13]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date99921952.013.05.1999
[2001/13]
WO1999US10603
Priority number, dateUS19980085710P15.05.1998         Original published format: US 85710 P
[2001/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9960737
Date:25.11.1999
Language:EN
[1999/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1086541
Date:28.03.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.1999
[2001/13]
Search report(s)International search reportEP25.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04J3/06
[2001/13]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FI,   GB,   IT,   SE [2001/13]
TitleGerman:SIGNALDEKODIERUNGEN IN EINEM MOBILEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM MIT ODER OHNE EINEM ZWEITEN SYNCHRONISATIONSWORT[2001/13]
English:SIGNAL DECODING WITH OR WITHOUT SECOND SYNCHRONIZATION WORD IN A MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM[2001/13]
French:DECODAGE DE SIGNAUX AVEC OU SANS DEUXIEME MOT DE SYNCHRONISATION DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE[2001/13]
Entry into regional phase08.11.2000National basic fee paid 
08.11.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
08.11.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.12.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
08.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/13]
17.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.07.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/06]
06.09.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
21.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
26.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
24.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
19.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[A]DE2739978  (TEKADE FELTEN & GUILLEAUME) [A] 1-25 * page 3, line 7 - line 21 * * page 4, line 12 - line 19 * * page 5, line 15 - line 25 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0269974  (IBM [US]) [A] 1-25 * column 4, line 6 - line 11 * * figure 2 *;
 [DA]EP0594551  (ERICSSON GE MOBILE COMMUNICAT [US]) [DA] 1-25 * column 1, line 10 - line 28 * * column 5, line 16 - line 36 * * figure 2B *